Innobrilliance, LLC v. Funai Corporation, Inc.
Georgia Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Steven D Grimberg |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-03102 |
Nature of Suit | 830 Property Rights - Patent |
Cause | 28:1338 Patent Infringement |
Case Filed: | Jul 15, 2024 |
Last checked: Thursday Aug 29, 2024 6:09 AM EDT |
Defendant
Funai Corporation, Inc.
|
|
Plaintiff
Innobrilliance, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 11 hours ago |
Friday, August 30, 2024 | ||
utility
Submission to District Judge
Fri 08/30 5:14 PM
Submission of10 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint,to District Judge Steven D. Grimberg. (dnb) |
||
Monday, August 12, 2024 | ||
10 | 10
motion
Extension of Time to File Answer to Complaint
Mon 08/12 8:01 AM
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint,, by Innobrilliance, LLC.(Rabicoff, Isaac) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order | ||
Wednesday, July 24, 2024 | ||
misc
Approval of Application for Admission PHV
Wed 07/24 1:59 PM
APPROVAL by Clerks Office re:8 APPLICATION for Admission of Isaac Rabicoff Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 100, receipt number AGANDC-13589584). Attorney Isaac P. Rabicoff added appearing on behalf of Innobrilliance, LLC. E-filing access may be requested after an order granting the application is entered. (esr) |
||
order
Order on Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice
Wed 07/24 2:26 PM
ORDER granting8 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Isaac Rabicoff. Approved by Judge Steven D. Grimberg on 7/24/2024. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(dnb) |
||
Tuesday, July 23, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
motion
Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice
Tue 07/23 7:51 AM
APPLICATION for Admission of Isaac Rabicoff Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 100, receipt number AGANDC-13589584).by Innobrilliance, LLC. (Anderson, Stephen) |
|
7 | 7
service
Affidavit of Service
Tue 07/23 7:41 AM
AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint (Dkt. 1); Summons (Dkt. 4); AO Form 120 (Dkt. 2); Disclosure Statement (Dkt. 3); and, Standing Order Regarding Civil Litigation (Dkt. 6) , as to Cogency Global Inc. . (Anderson, Stephen) |
|
Monday, July 15, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
30+
pgs
order
Order
Mon 07/15 2:56 PM
STANDING ORDER REGARDING CIVIL LITIGATION. Signed by Judge Steven D. Grimberg on 7/15/2024. (tas) |
|
5 | 5
misc
Letter re:83.1
Mon 07/15 2:43 PM
Letter from Clerk re: LR 83.1 Pro Hac Vice requirements sent to Isaac P. Rabicoff. Clerk to follow-up by 7/25/2024. (djs) |
|
4 | 4
service
Electronic Summons Issued
Mon 07/15 2:25 PM
Electronic Summons Issued as to Funai Corporation, Inc. (tas) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Certificate of Interested Persons/Corporate Disclosure Statement
Mon 07/15 2:23 PM
Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Innobrilliance, LLC. (tas) |
|
2 | 2
misc
A.O. Form 120
Mon 07/15 2:21 PM
AO Form 120 forwarded to Commissioner. (tas) |
|
1 | 1
10
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Mon 07/15 2:18 PM
COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Innobrilliance, LLC. (Filing fee $405, receipt number AGANDC-13571182)(tas) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit USPN 8,925,010, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit USPN 9,247,299, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit Exemplar Claim Chart for USPN 8,925,010, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit Exemplar Claim Chart for USPN 9,247,299, | ||
Att: 5 Civil Cover Sheet |