Daker v. Jones et al
Georgia Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Steven D Grimberg |
Referred: | Walter E Johnson |
Case #: | 4:24-cv-00173 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Jul 15, 2024 |
Last checked: Thursday Aug 29, 2024 6:09 AM EDT |
Defendant
Counselor FNU Couch
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Segeant FNU Woodward
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Russell Victor
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Deputy warden Jonathan Swinford
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Lieutenant Kimberly Stewart
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Lieutenant FNU Stewart
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Unit Manager First Name Unknown Roland
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Sergeant Kaitlynne McGhee
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Deputy Warden Christopher McAlister
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Captain Scott Lowe
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Warden Joshua Jones
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Gabriel Illa
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Sergeant Tyler Holliday
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Chief Counselor Michael Held
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Hays State Prison
|
|
Defendant
Alisa Hammock-Evans
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Waseem Daker
#901373 Hays State Prison 777 Underwood Dr P.O. Box 668
Trion, GA 30753 |
Docket last updated: 11 hours ago |
Tuesday, September 03, 2024 | ||
27 | 27
notice
Notice of Filing
Wed 09/04 2:50 PM
NOTICE Of Filing Second Supplemental Declaration of Waseem Daker by Waseem Daker re16 MOTION Stop Defendants Delaying, Discarding, or Interfering with Plaintiff's Mail. (gww) |
|
26 | 26
motion
Leave to File Document
Wed 09/04 2:46 PM
MOTION for Leave to File to File Sur-Reply to Defendants reply to doc15 in Support of Their7 Motion to Sever,8 Motion to Stay Answer Deadline and Discovery, and9 Motion for Protective Order.by Waseem Daker. (gww) |
|
25 | 25
motion
Stay
Wed 09/04 2:43 PM
MOTION to Stay by Waseem Daker. (gww) |
|
utility
Submission to Magistrate Judge
Tue 09/03 1:04 PM
Submission of19 MOTION to Exempt Plaintiff from Having to Serve Defendants,20 MOTION for Declaratory Judgment Regarding Law Library Access MOTION for Permanent Injunction,21 MOTION to Stay, to Magistrate Judge Walter E. Johnson. (dnb) |
||
Thursday, August 29, 2024 | ||
24 | 24
respm
Response in Opposition to Motion
Thu 08/29 3:48 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re20 MOTION for Declaratory Judgment Regarding Law Library Access MOTION for Permanent Injunction filed by FNU Couch, Alisa Hammock-Evans, Michael Held, Tyler Holliday, Gabriel Illa, Joshua Jones, Scott Lowe, Christopher McAlister, Kaitlynne McGhee, First Name Unknown Roland, FNU Stewart, Kimberly Stewart, Jonathan Swinford, Russell Victor, FNU Woodward.(Ficarrotta, Daniel) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit (Declaration of Joshua Jones with Attachments) | ||
Monday, August 26, 2024 | ||
utility
Submission to Magistrate Judge
Mon 08/26 9:01 AM
Submission of16 MOTION Stop Defendants Delaying, Discarding, or Interfering with Plaintiff's Mail,14 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM ,21 MOTION to Stay, to Magistrate Judge Walter E. Johnson. (klb) |
||
Friday, August 16, 2024 | ||
23 | 23
respm
Response in Opposition to Motion
Fri 08/16 2:07 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re9 MOTION for Protective Order filed by Waseem Daker. (tas) |
|
22 | 22
respm
Response in Opposition to Motion
Fri 08/16 1:57 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re8 MOTION to Stay Answer Deadline and Discovery filed by Waseem Daker. (tas) |
|
21 | 21
motion
Stay
Fri 08/16 1:56 PM
MOTION to Stay Defendant's Motion to Sever by Waseem Daker. (tas) |
|
18 | 18
respm
Response in Opposition to Motion
Fri 08/16 9:55 AM
RESPONSE in Opposition re16 MOTION Stop Defendants Delaying, Discarding, or Interfering with Plaintiff's Mail filed by FNU Couch, Alisa Hammock-Evans, Michael Held, Tyler Holliday, Gabriel Illa, Joshua Jones, Scott Lowe, Christopher McAlister, Kaitlynne McGhee, First Name Unknown Roland, FNU Stewart, Kimberly Stewart, Jonathan Swinford, Russell Victor, FNU Woodward. (Ficarrotta, Daniel) |
|
Thursday, August 15, 2024 | ||
20 | 20
motion
Miscellaneous Relief Permanent Injunction
Fri 08/16 1:16 PM
MOTION for Declaratory Judgment Regarding Law Library Access, MOTION for Writ of Mandamus and Permanent Injunction by Waseem Daker. (tas) |
|
19 | 19
motion
Miscellaneous Relief
Fri 08/16 12:32 PM
MOTION to Exempt Plaintiff from Having to Serve Defendants by Waseem Daker. (tas) |
|
Wednesday, August 14, 2024 | ||
utility
Submission to Magistrate Judge
Wed 08/14 10:03 AM
Submission of12 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Defendant's7 Motion to Sever,8 Motion to Stay Answer Deadline and Discovery, and9 Motion for Protective Order, to Magistrate Judge Walter E. Johnson. (klb) |
||
Monday, August 12, 2024 | ||
17 | 17
notice
Notice of Filing
Tue 08/13 1:14 PM
NOTICE Of Filing Supplemental Declaration in Support of by Waseem Daker re16 MOTION Stop Defendants Delaying, Discarding, or Interfering with Plaintiff's Mail. (tas) |
|
Wednesday, August 07, 2024 | ||
16 | 16
motion
Miscellaneous Relief
Thu 08/08 9:01 AM
MOTION Stop Defendants Delaying, Discarding, or Interfering with Plaintiff's Mail by Waseem Daker. (tas) |
|
15 | 15
respm
Reply to Response to Motion
Wed 08/07 11:58 AM
REPLY to Response to Motion re12 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Defendant's7 Motion to Sever,8 Motion to Stay Answer Deadline and Discovery, and9 Motion for Protective Order filed by FNU Couch, Alisa Hammock-Evans, Michael Held, Tyler Holliday, Gabriel Illa, Joshua Jones, Scott Lowe, Christopher McAlister, Kaitlynne McGhee, First Name Unknown Roland, FNU Stewart, Kimberly Stewart, Jonathan Swinford, Russell Victor, FNU Woodward. (Ficarrotta, Daniel) |
|
14 | 14
motion
Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim
Wed 08/07 10:55 AM
MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Kaitlynne McGhee. (Ficarrotta, Daniel) |
|
Wednesday, July 31, 2024 | ||
13 | 13
respm
Response in Opposition to Motion
Wed 07/31 2:55 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re10 MOTION to Sever , Motion to Stay the Answer Deadline and Discovery, and Motion for Protective Order MOTION to Stay MOTION for Protective Order filed by Waseem Daker. (tas) |
|
12 | 12
motion
Extension of Time
Wed 07/31 2:51 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Defendant's7 Motion to Sever,8 Motion to Stay Answer Deadline and Discovery, and9 Motion for Protective Order by Waseem Daker. (tas) |
|
Tuesday, July 16, 2024 | ||
11 | 11
1
pgs
order
Order Reassigning Case
Tue 07/16 3:48 PM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Steven D. Grimberg for all further proceedings. Judge William M. Ray, II no longer assigned to case. NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL OF RECORD: The Judge designation in the civil action number assigned to this case has been changed to 4:24-cv-173-SDG. Please make note of this change in order to facilitate the docketing of pleadings in this case. Signed by Judge William M. Ray, II on 7/16/24. (jpa) |
|
10 | 10
motion
Sever
Tue 07/16 3:33 PM
MOTION to Sever , Motion to Stay the Answer Deadline and Discovery, and Motion for Protective Order by FNU Couch, Scott Lowe, Christopher McAlister, First Name Unknown Roland, Jonathan Swinford. (Ficarrotta, Daniel) |
|
utility
Clerks Certificate of Mailing
Tue 07/16 3:50 PM
Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Waseem Daker re11 Order Reassigning Case. (jpa) |
||
Monday, July 15, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
motion
Protective Order
Mon 07/15 3:12 PM
MOTION for Protective Order with Brief In Support by Alisa Hammock-Evans, Michael Held, Tyler Holliday, Gabriel Illa, Joshua Jones, Kaitlynne McGhee, FNU Stewart, Kimberly Stewart, Russell Victor, FNU Woodward.(Ficarrotta, Daniel) |
|
Att: 1 Brief Brief in Support of Motion for Protective Order | ||
8 | 8
motion
Stay
Mon 07/15 3:08 PM
MOTION to Stay Answer Deadline and Discovery with Brief In Support by Alisa Hammock-Evans, Michael Held, Tyler Holliday, Gabriel Illa, Joshua Jones, Kaitlynne McGhee, FNU Stewart, Kimberly Stewart, Russell Victor, FNU Woodward.(Ficarrotta, Daniel) |
|
Att: 1 Brief Brief in Support of Motion to Stay Answer Deadline and Discovery | ||
7 | 7
motion
Sever
Mon 07/15 3:05 PM
MOTION to Sever with Brief In Support by Alisa Hammock-Evans, Michael Held, Tyler Holliday, Gabriel Illa, Joshua Jones, Kaitlynne McGhee, FNU Stewart, Kimberly Stewart, Russell Victor, FNU Woodward.(Ficarrotta, Daniel) |
|
Att: 1 Brief Brief in Support of Motion to Sever | ||
6 | 6
answer
Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal)
Mon 07/15 2:19 PM
(Filed in Superior Court of Chattooga County on 7/2/2024) ANSWER to1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Kaitlynne McGhee.(jpa) |
|
5 | 5
motion
Strike
Mon 07/15 2:09 PM
(Filed in Superior Court of Chattooga County on 7/1/24) MOTION to Strike3 MOTION to revoke in forma pauperis statusMOTION to Dismiss by Waseem Daker. (jpa) |
|
4 | 4
motion
Permanent Injunction Preliminary Injunction
Mon 07/15 2:08 PM
(Filed in Superior Court of Chattooga County on 6/6/24) MOTION for Permanent Injunction, alternatively, interlocutory Injunction, and for evidentiary hearing by Waseem Daker. (jpa) |
|
3 | 3
motion
Miscellaneous Relief Dismiss
Mon 07/15 2:05 PM
(Filed in Superior Court of Chattooga County on 4/26/24) MOTION to revoke in forma pauperis status, or in the alternative, MOTION to Dismiss by Joshua Jones. (jpa) |
|
2 | 2
answer
Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal)
Mon 07/15 1:58 PM
(Filed in Superior Court case on 4/26/24) ANSWER to1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Joshua Jones. Discovery ends on 12/12/2024.(jpa) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Notice of Removal
Mon 07/15 1:51 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL with COMPLAINT filed by Waseem Daker. (Filing fee $ 405 receipt number AGANDC-13571436)(jpa) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
utility
Case Referred to Magistrate Judge
Tue 07/16 4:07 PM
CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Walter E. Johnson. (jpa) |