Hickman v. Warden
Indiana Northern District Court | |
Judge: | James T Moody |
Referred: | Abizer Zanzi |
Case #: | 3:24-cv-00568 |
Nature of Suit | 530 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - General |
Cause | 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State) |
Case Filed: | Jul 09, 2024 |
Last checked: Tuesday Jul 16, 2024 11:10 PM EDT |
Petitioner
Anthony S Hickman
167928 Reception Diagnostic Center 737 Moon Road
Plainfield, IN 46168 |
|
Respondent
Warden
|
Docket last updated: 11 hours ago |
Tuesday, July 30, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
misc
Mail Returned
Tue 07/30 12:20 PM
Mail Returned from Anthony S Hickman as Undeliverable -2 Order and Docket Sheet. Envelope marked Return to Sender - Not Deliverable as Addressed - Unable to Forward. (Previously resent at DE5 to updated address at Westville C.F.) (ash) |
|
Tuesday, July 23, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Mail Returned
Tue 07/23 2:13 PM
Mail Returned from Anthony S Hickman as Undeliverable -1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. (from case 1:24cv269 . (mrm) |
|
Thursday, July 18, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Notice of Change of Address
Mon 07/22 8:51 AM
NOTICE of Change of Address by Anthony S Hickman from Reception Diagnostic Center to Westville Correctional Facility per DE3 Envelope. (ash) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Letter
Mon 07/22 8:46 AM
Letter from Anthony Hickman requesting status of case. (Docket sheet mailed to plaintiff) (ash) |
|
Att: 1 Envelope | ||
Friday, July 12, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
2
pgs
order
Order
Mon 07/15 11:15 AM
ORDER: The Clerk is DIRECTED to close case 1:24-cv-269 and open a new case with these filings in the South Bend Division with the same judges. Signed by Magistrate Judge Abizer Zanzi on 7/12/2024.(Copy mailed to pro se party)(mrm) |
|
Monday, July 08, 2024 | ||
1 | 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Anthony S Hickman. (No Filing fee or IFP received)(mrm) | |
Att: 1 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 2 Envelope |