Huston v. Unknown Parties et al
Michigan Western District Court | |
Judge: | Sally J Berens |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-00716 |
Nature of Suit | 555 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Prison Condition |
Cause | 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Jul 12, 2024 |
Terminated: | Jul 23, 2024 |
defendant
Unknown Herbert
|
|
defendant
Unknown Hoult
|
|
defendant
Unknown Parties
|
|
plaintiff
Cecil De Huston Sr.
|
Docket last updated: 11 hours ago |
Tuesday, July 23, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
order
Judgment - Frivolous, Malicious, or for Failure to State a Claim (Prisoner Civil Rights Case)
Tue 07/23 8:45 AM
JUDGMENT that the action is dismissed with prejudice for failure to state a claim; signed by Magistrate Judge Sally J. Berens (jln) |
|
5 | 5
10
pgs
order
Opinion (Screening)
Tue 07/23 8:44 AM
OPINION; signed by Magistrate Judge Sally J. Berens (jln) |
|
4 | 4
2
pgs
order
Order to Proceed IFP - Prisoner
Tue 07/23 8:43 AM
ORDER TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS and FOR PAYMENT OF FILING FEE: plaintiff may proceed in forma pauperis without payment of an initial partial filing fee; plaintiff to remain liable for the filing fee as funds become available; signed by Magistrate Judge Sally J. Berens (jln) |
|
utility
Copies Mailed
Tue 07/23 12:20 PM
Copy of Order to Proceed IFP - Prisoner,4 , Opinion (Screening)5 , Judgment - Frivolous, Malicious, or for Failure to State a Claim (Prisoner Civil Rights Case)6 sent via U.S. Mail to Cecil De Huston, Sr. (ns) |
||
Monday, July 15, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
misc
Receipt of Case Notice
Mon 07/15 1:28 PM
NOTICE of receipt of case (mlc) |
|
utility
Copies Mailed
Mon 07/15 1:30 PM
Copy of Receipt of Case Notice3 sent via U.S. Mail to Cecil De Huston (mlc) |
||
Friday, July 12, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
misc
Affidavit
Mon 07/15 1:25 PM
AFFIDAVIT of indigence by plaintiff Cecil De Huston, Sr (mlc) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Mon 07/15 1:22 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Cecil De Huston, Sr (mlc) |
|
misc
Statement Regarding Consent (Prisoner Civil Rights/Habeas Case)
Mon 07/15 1:27 PM
STATEMENT RE CONSENT (as taken from1 ) by plaintiff Cecil De Huston, Sr consenting to proceed before the Magistrate Judge (mlc) |