Tompkins #518783 v. Thompson et al
Michigan Western District Court | |
Judge: | Jane M Beckering |
Referred: | Phillip J Green |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-00719 |
Nature of Suit | 540 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Mandamus & Other |
Cause | 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State) |
Case Filed: | Jul 12, 2024 |
Terminated: | Aug 08, 2024 |
petitioner
Boston Jermaine Tompkins #518783
|
|
respondent
Alesha Holicki
|
|
respondent
Dana Nessel
|
|
respondent
David A. Thompson
|
|
respondent
Erich J. Smith
|
|
respondent
Fred Miller
|
|
respondent
H. Steven Langschwagger
|
|
respondent
Jennifer Houke-Born
|
|
respondent
Michael Burgess
|
Docket last updated: 11 hours ago |
Friday, August 09, 2024 | ||
utility
Copies Mailed
Fri 08/09 11:39 AM
Copy of Order to Proceed IFP (Habeas)6 , Order Denying Certificate of Appealability8 , Judgment Dismissing Habeas Action Under Rule 49 , Opinion (Screening)7 sent via U.S. Mail to Boston Jermaine Tompkins (slk) |
||
Thursday, August 08, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
order
Judgment Dismissing Habeas Action Under Rule 4
Thu 08/08 11:10 AM
JUDGMENT dismissing habeas action under Rule 4; signed by District Judge Jane M. Beckering (lep) |
|
8 | 8
1
pgs
order
Order Denying Certificate of Appealability
Thu 08/08 11:09 AM
ORDER denying certificate of appealability; signed by District Judge Jane M. Beckering (lep) |
|
7 | 7
9
pgs
order
Opinion (Screening)
Thu 08/08 11:09 AM
OPINION; signed by District Judge Jane M. Beckering (lep) |
|
6 | 6
1
pgs
order
Order to Proceed IFP (Habeas)
Thu 08/08 11:08 AM
ORDER granting petitioner leave to proceed in forma pauperis in a habeas action; signed by District Judge Jane M. Beckering (lep) |
|
Thursday, August 01, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
notice
Change of Address - Prisoner or Pro Se
Thu 08/01 3:37 PM
CHANGE OF ADDRESS for petitioner Boston Jermaine Tompkins #518783 to St. Louis Correctional Facility 8585 N Croswell Rd. St. Louis, MI 48880 (eod) |
|
utility
Copies Mailed
Thu 08/01 3:38 PM
Copy of Receipt of Case Notice3 , Order4 sent via U.S. Mail to Boston Jermaine Tompkins (eod) |
||
Friday, July 26, 2024 | ||
utility
Copies Mailed
Fri 07/26 10:08 AM
Copy of Order4 sent via U.S. Mail to Boston Jermaine Tompkins #518783 (ems) |
||
Thursday, July 25, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
4
pgs
order
Order
Thu 07/25 1:35 PM
ORDER that the Clerk of Court shall sever plaintiff's claim for monetary compensation into a separate action; signed by District Judge Jane M. Beckering (lep) |
|
Monday, July 15, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
misc
Receipt of Case Notice
Mon 07/15 12:20 PM
NOTICE of receipt of case (ns) |
|
utility
Copies Mailed
Mon 07/15 12:21 PM
Copy of Receipt of Case Notice3 sent via U.S. Mail to Boston Jermaine Tompkins #518783 (ns) |
||
Friday, July 12, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
motion
Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees
Mon 07/15 12:19 PM
APPLICATION TO PROCEED without prepayment of fees and affidavit (ns) |
|
Att: 1 Financial Documents | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint with Magistrate Referral
Mon 07/15 12:17 PM
COMPLAINT with magistrate referral against All Defendants filed by Boston Jermaine Tompkins #518783 (ns) |
|
Att: 1 Index, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit C, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit D, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit E, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit F, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit G, | ||
Att: 9 Exhibit H, | ||
Att: 10 Exhibit I | ||
misc
Statement Regarding Consent (Prisoner Civil Rights/Habeas Case)
Mon 07/15 12:19 PM
STATEMENT RE CONSENT (as taken from1 ) by plaintiff Boston Jermaine Tompkins #518783 requesting the case be assigned to a district judge (ns) |