Gilbert v. Grant et al
South Carolina District Court | |
Judge: | Jacquelyn D Austin |
Referred: | Kevin Mcdonald |
Case #: | 6:24-cv-03912 |
Nature of Suit | 550 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights, State Filers |
Case Filed: | Jul 11, 2024 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 09/11/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Thursday, September 05, 2024 | ||
21 | 21
misc
Document Mailed
Thu 09/05 4:04 PM
***DOCUMENT MAILED19 Proper Form Order, with Summons placed in U.S. Mail from Greenville Clerks Office to Beaufort County Detention Center, PO Drawer 1228, Beaufort, SC 29901 and 266 Morgan Road, Seabrooke, SC 29940 (pbri, ) |
|
20 | 20
misc
Document Mailed
Thu 09/05 2:36 PM
***DOCUMENT MAILED:19 Proper Form Order, with Summons placed in U.S. Mail from Greenville Clerks Office to Dominic Javon Gilbert#205486, Beaufort County Detention Cente,r PO Drawer 1228, Beaufort, SC 29901 and Dominic Javon Gilbert #205486, 266 Morgan Road, Seabrooke, SC 29940. (pbri, ) |
|
19 | 19
order
Proper Form Order
Thu 09/05 2:25 PM
SECOND PROPER FORM ORDER: Case to be brought into proper form by 9/16/2024. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kevin McDonald on 9/5/24. (pbri, ) Modified on 9/5/2024 to include second. (pbri, ) |
|
Monday, August 26, 2024 | ||
15 | 15
cmp
Amended Complaint
Mon 08/26 3:22 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against Castran Aiken, Quandara Grant, Latasha Robinson, filed by Dominic Javon Gilbert. Service due by 11/25/2024.(pbri, ) |
|
Att: 1 Envelope | ||
Thursday, August 08, 2024 | ||
13 | 13
misc
Document Mailed
Thu 08/08 9:43 AM
***DOCUMENT MAILED12 Order, with Amended Complaint with case number, Summons, 3 USM forms, placed in U.S. Mail from Greenville Clerks Office to Dominic Javon Gilbert #205486, Beaufort County Detention Center, PO Drawer 1228, Beaufort, SC 29901. (pbri, ) |
|
12 | 12
9
pgs
order
Order
Thu 08/08 9:41 AM
ORDER AND NOTICE REGARDING AMENDMENT: Amended Complaint and proposed service documents due by 8/22/2024. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kevin McDonald on 8/8/24. (pbri, ) |
|
Tuesday, July 23, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
misc
Document Mailed
Tue 07/23 3:16 PM
***DOCUMENT MAILED:7 Proper Form Order, 8 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis with 2 USM forms placed in U.S. Mail from Greenville Clerks Office to Dominic Javon Gilbert 205486, Beaufort County Detention Center, PO Drawer 1228, Beaufort, SC 29901. (pbri, ) |
|
8 | 8
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Tue 07/23 3:14 PM
TEXT ORDER granting 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kevin McDonald on 7/23/24.(pbri, ) |
|
7 | 7
order
Proper Form Order
Tue 07/23 3:12 PM
PROPER FORM ORDER: Case to be brought into proper form by 8/13/2024. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kevin McDonald on 7/23/24. (pbri, ) |
|
Monday, July 15, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
misc
True Division for Trial
Mon 07/15 12:07 PM
TRUE DIVISION FOR TRIAL: Beaufort. (pbri, ) |
|
Thursday, July 11, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Mon 07/15 12:03 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Dominic Javon Gilbert. Response to Motion due by 7/25/2024. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45.No proposed order. Motions referred to Kevin McDonald.(pbri, ) |
|
Att: 1 Financial Documentation | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Mon 07/15 11:45 AM
COMPLAINT against Castran Aiken, Quandara Grant, Latasha Robinson, filed by Dominic Javon Gilbert. Service due by 10/9/2024.(pbri, ) |
|
Att: 1 Supporting Documents, | ||
Att: 2 Envelope |