Esder v. Hara Inc.
Tennessee Middle District Court | |
Judge: | Waverly D Crenshaw, Jr |
Referred: | Alistair Newbern |
Case #: | 3:24-cv-00851 |
Nature of Suit | 710 Labor - Fair Labor Standards Act |
Cause | 29:201 Fair Labor Standards Act |
Case Filed: | Jul 12, 2024 |
Last checked: Tuesday Aug 27, 2024 4:29 AM CDT |
Defendant
Hara Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Michael Esder
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 10 hours ago |
Monday, August 26, 2024 | ||
misc
Annotation - Bar Status
Mon 08/26 3:06 PM
TN State Bar status verified as active for Kara E. Shea admitted to this court . (kc) |
||
misc
Annotation - Bar Status
Mon 08/26 3:07 PM
AL State Bar status verified as active for Lieselotte Margaret Carmen-Burks admitted to this court . Local counsel secured. (kc) |
||
Thursday, August 22, 2024 | ||
12 | 12
3
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
Thu 08/22 2:10 PM
ORDER: The Motion11 for Extension of Time to Answer re1 Complaint is GRANTED. Hara Inc. answer due 9/10/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern on 08/22/24. (ad) |
|
Wednesday, August 21, 2024 | ||
11 | 11
motion
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Wed 08/21 5:04 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to1 Complaint by Hara Inc.. (Shea, Kara) |
|
10 | 10
notice
Notice of Appearance
Wed 08/21 5:00 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Lieselotte Margaret Carmen-Burks on behalf of Hara Inc. (Carmen-Burks, Lieselotte) |
|
9 | 9
notice
Notice of Appearance
Wed 08/21 4:48 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Kara E. Shea on behalf of Hara Inc. (Shea, Kara) |
|
Friday, August 09, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
service
Summons Returned Executed
Fri 08/09 4:48 PM
SUMMONS returned executed by Michael Esder. All Defendants. (Weatherman, David) |
|
Friday, July 19, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
2
pgs
order
Order
Fri 07/19 1:35 PM
ORDER: This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management in accordance with Local Rule 16.01 and 28 U.S.C. § 636(b)(1)(A). Signed by District Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr on 7/19/2024. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.) (am) |
|
Monday, July 15, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
notice
Notice of Case Management Conference
Mon 07/15 10:14 AM
NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference by Telephone set for 9/10/2024 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern. (am) |
|
5 | 5
service
Summons Issued
Mon 07/15 10:13 AM
Summons issued as to Hara Inc. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for printing and serving the attached issued summons. (am) |
|
4 | 4
notice
Notice of Admin Order 217
Mon 07/15 10:11 AM
NOTICE OF ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER NO. 217 to parties re obligation of counsel to keep Court apprised of current contact information. (am) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Notice/Information re Consent of the Parties to MJ
Mon 07/15 10:11 AM
NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (am) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Notice of Business Entity Disclosure Statement Filing Requirement
Mon 07/15 10:11 AM
NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (am) |
|
misc
Annotation - Bar Status
Mon 07/15 10:17 AM
TN State Bar status verified as active for David B. Weatherman, Daniel E. Arciniegas admitted to this court . (am) |
||
Friday, July 12, 2024 | ||
1 | 1
11
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Mon 07/15 10:11 AM
COMPLAINT against Hara Inc. (Filing fee $405, Receipt number ATNMDC-4119173), filed by Michael Esder.(am) |
|
Att: 1 Attachment - Civil Cover Sheet |