Twiggs #075447 v. Thornell et al
Arizona District Court | |
Judge: | Susan R Bolton |
Referred: | Alison S Bachus |
Case #: | 2:24-cv-01727 |
Nature of Suit | 530 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - General |
Cause | 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State) |
Case Filed: | Jul 12, 2024 |
Terminated: | Sep 03, 2024 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 8 hours ago |
Tuesday, September 03, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
order
Clerks Judgment
Tue 09/03 10:15 AM
CLERK'S JUDGMENT - IT IS ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that pursuant to the Court's Order filed September 3, 2024, Petitioner's Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 2254 is dismissed. Petitioner to take nothing and this action is hereby dismissed without prejudice. (KLG) |
|
5 | 5
7
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Tue 09/03 10:12 AM
ORDER that Petitioner's Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis2 is granted. Petitioner's Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus1 and this action are dismissed without prejudice, and the Clerk of Court must enter judgment accordingly. The Clerk of Court must provide Petitioner with a copy of the form recommended by the Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals for filing an Application for Leave to File Second or Successive Petition Under 28 U.S.C. § 2254 or Motion Under 28 U.S.C. § 2255. Pursuant to Rule 11(a) of the Rules Governing Section 2254 Cases, in the event Petitioner files an appeal, the Court declines to issue a certificate of appealability because reasonable jurists would not find the Court's procedural ruling debatable. See Slack v. McDaniel, 529 U.S. 473, 484 (2000). Signed by Senior Judge Susan R Bolton on 9/3/2024. (KLG) |
|
Friday, July 12, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Notice: Prisoner Case Subject to Electronic Filing
Mon 07/15 2:19 PM
NOTICE: This case is subject to electronic filing. Please review the attached documents. (KLG) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Notice of Assignment
Mon 07/15 2:18 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT (KLG) |
|
Att: 1 Instructions | ||
2 | 2
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Mon 07/15 2:17 PM
APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Donnie Romone Twiggs. (2 Pages) (KLG) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State/2254)
Mon 07/15 2:16 PM
PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State/2254) filed by Donnie Romone Twiggs. (134 Pages)(KLG) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibits |