Croff v. Arizona, State of et al
Arizona District Court | |
Judge: | Stephen M Mcnamee |
Referred: | Camille D Bibles |
Case #: | 2:24-cv-01732 |
Nature of Suit | 555 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Prison Condition |
Cause | 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Civil Rights Act |
Case Filed: | Jul 12, 2024 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 8 hours ago |
Monday, August 19, 2024 | ||
12 | 12
respm
Reply to Response to Motion to Consolidate/Transfer Cases
Mon 08/19 4:06 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re: (4665 in 2:12-cv-00601-ROS) MOTION to Transfer Related Case filed by JoAnn Croff. (Associated Cases: 2:24-cv-01732-SMM--CDB, 2:12-cv-00601-ROS) (Bertrand, Joy) |
|
Monday, August 12, 2024 | ||
11 | 11
misc
Joinder to Motion to Consolidate/Transfer Cases
Tue 08/13 8:32 AM
Joinder re:(4665 in 2:12-cv-00601-ROS) MOTION to Transfer Related Case filed by Centurion of Arizona LLC. **Redocketed by Clerk using correct event for statistical purposes.** (Associated Cases: 2:12-cv-00601-ROS, 2:24-cv-01732-SMM--CDB) (DXD) |
|
10 | 10
misc
Joinder
Mon 08/12 7:23 PM
Joinder re:9 Response to Motion to Consolidate/Transfer Cases, by Defendant Centurion of Arizona LLC. (Flores, Krystal) |
|
9 | 9
respm
Response to Motion to Consolidate/Transfer Cases
Mon 08/12 4:28 PM
RESPONSE to Motion re: (4665 in 2:12-cv-00601-ROS, 4665 in 2:12-cv-00601-ROS) MOTION to Transfer Related Case filed by Arizona, State of. (Associated Cases: 2:24-cv-01732-SMM--CDB, 2:12-cv-00601-ROS) (Roubicek, Laura) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 3, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit 4 | ||
Thursday, August 08, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
motion
Extension of Time
Thu 08/08 4:02 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time TIME TO FILE ANSWER OR OTHER RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT by Arizona, State of.(Roubicek, Laura) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, August 06, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
notice
Notice (Other)
Tue 08/06 3:08 PM
NOTICE re: Notice of Withdrawal by Arizona, State of . (Roubicek, Laura) |
|
Friday, July 26, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
motion
Transfer Related Case
Mon 07/29 11:17 AM
MOTION to Transfer Related Case by JoAnn Croff. **Redocketed by Clerk to appear in all associated cases for statistical purposes.** (Associated Cases: CV 24-01732 PHX-SMM, CV 12-00601 PHX-ROS) (DXD) |
|
5 | 5
motion
Transfer Related Case
Fri 07/26 7:20 PM
MOTION to Transfer Related Case by JoAnn Croff. (Associated Cases: CV 12-00601 PHX-ROS) (Bertrand, Joy) |
|
Monday, July 15, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Mon 07/15 12:40 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Centurion of Arizona LLC. (Barnes, Sarah) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Notice of Deficiency re Disclosure Statement
Mon 07/15 12:05 PM
NOTICE TO PARTY RE: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT: Pursuant to FRCiv 7.1 and LRCiv 7.1.1 the attached Disclosure Statement form must be filed by all nongovernmental corporate parties with their first appearance. A supplemental statement must be filed upon any change in the information. In addition, if not already filed, the Disclosure Statement should be filed within 14 days. Disclosure Statement Deadline set as to Centurion of Arizona LLC. (REK) |
|
Friday, July 12, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
notice
Notice of Assignment
Mon 07/15 11:59 AM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT (REK) |
|
Att: 1 Instructions | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Notice of Removal
Mon 07/15 11:40 AM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Maricopa County Superior Court, case number CV2023-015723. Filing fee received: $405.00, receipt number AAZDC-23241270 filed by Centurion of Arizona LLC. (submitted by Sarah Barnes)(REK) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 3 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet | ||
service
Service Executed
Mon 07/15 11:45 AM
***State Court record received on 7/12/2024***SERVICE EXECUTED filed by JoAnn Croff: Affidavit of Service re: Summons, First Amended Complaint, and Certificate of Compulsory Arbitration upon Centurion Managed Care Incorporated via CT Corporation System, Ryan Thornell, and State of Arizona on 1/05/2024.***Affidavits of Service of Process filed in State Court on 1/08/2024, docketed in U.S. District Court on 7/12/2024 for case management purposes.*** (REK) |
||
service
Service Unexecuted
Mon 07/15 11:53 AM
***State Court record received on 7/12/2024***Service Returned Unexecuted by JoAnn Croff: Amended Complaint as to Centurion Managed Care Incorporated via C T Corporation.***Notice of Rejected Service of Process filed in State Court on 5/28/2024, docketed in U.S. District Court on 7/12/2024 for case management purposes.*** (REK) |
||
service
Service Executed
Mon 07/15 11:56 AM
***State Court Record Received on 7/12/2024***SERVICE EXECUTED filed by JoAnn Croff: Rule 4 Waiver of Service of Summons. Waiver sent on 6/13/2024 to Centurion of Arizona LLC.***Waiver of Service docketed in U.S. District Court on 7/12/2024 for case management purposes.*** (REK) |