Soraya Watson v. Accenture LLP
California Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Vince Chhabria |
Case #: | 3:24-cv-04247 |
Nature of Suit | 790 Labor - Other Labor Litigation |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-(Citizenship) |
Case Filed: | Jul 15, 2024 |
Last checked: Thursday Aug 29, 2024 3:02 AM PDT |
Defendant
Accenture LLP
|
Represented By
|
Petitioner
Soraya Watson
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/15/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Wednesday, August 28, 2024 | ||
13 | 13
order
Order ~Util - Terminate Motions
Wed 08/28 4:22 PM
ORDER. The stipulation is denied in part because this Court does not have authority to stay the PAGA action pending in state court. However, the stipulation is granted to the extent the parties request dismissal of the class claims in this case without prejudice and a stay of Watson's individual claims in this case. Accordingly, the class claims are dismissed without prejudice, and the remainder of the case is stayed pending arbitration. A further case management conference is scheduled for June 6, 2025, with a joint case management statement due 7 days prior. Signed by Judge Vince Chhabria on 8/28/2024. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (vclc1, COURT STAFF) |
|
utility
Set Deadlines/Hearings
Wed 08/28 4:34 PM
Set Deadlines/Hearings re dkt. 13: Case Management Statement due by 5/30/2025. Case Management Conference set for 6/6/2025 at 10:00 AM by Videoconference Only. (bxs, COURT STAFF) |
||
Wednesday, August 21, 2024 | ||
12 | 12
respm
Notice of Withdrawal of Motion
Wed 08/21 5:02 PM
Notice of Withdrawal of Motion (Collins, Sophia) |
|
11 | 11
motion
Stipulation and Proposed Order
Wed 08/21 4:31 PM
STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER To Dismiss Class Claims And Stay Case Pending Arbitration filed by Accenture LLP. (Collins, Sophia) |
|
10 | 10
motion
Stay
Wed 08/21 3:56 PM
Joint MOTION to Stay re1 Notice of Removal,, Arbitrate Individual Claims, Dismiss Class Claims and Stay action Pending Arbitration filed by Accenture LLP. Responses due by 9/4/2024. Replies due by 9/11/2024. (Boxer, Sarah) |
|
Friday, July 26, 2024 | ||
respoth
Answer to Removal Complaint
Fri 07/26 3:26 PM
Answer to Removal Complaint Exhibit 5 by Accenture LLP. (kmg, COURT STAFF) |
||
Wednesday, July 24, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
1
pgs
order
Order Reassigning Case ~Util - Case Assigned/Reassigned
Wed 07/24 12:51 PM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE.Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Vince Chhabria for all further proceedings.Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore no longer assigned to case. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by The Clerk on 07/24/2024.(kxo, COURT STAFF) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) |
|
Att: 1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording | ||
Monday, July 15, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
misc
Affidavit
Mon 07/15 7:16 PM
AFFIDAVIT re1 Notice of Removal,, Certification of Conflicts and Interested Entities or Parties by Accenture LLP. (Boxer, Sarah) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Notice of Removal
Mon 07/15 7:11 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior court - county of San Francisco. Their case number is CGC-24-615254. (Filing fee $405 receipt number ACANDC-19619771). Filed by Accenture LLP.(Boxer, Sarah) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration of S. Burroughs in support of Removal, | ||
Att: 2 Declaration of Robert F. Goldman in support of Removal, | ||
Att: 3 Declaration of Sarah Boxer in support of removal, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit 1 - Complaint and Civil Cover sheet, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit 2 - Notice to Plaintiff and CMC, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit 3 - Summons, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit 4 - Proofs of Service, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit 5 - Answer and POS, | ||
Att: 9 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 10 Certificate/Proof of Service Proof of Service - electronic |