Oum v. LG Energy Solution Michigan, Inc.
Michigan Western District Court | |
Judge: | Paul L Maloney |
Referred: | Ray Kent |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-00729 |
Nature of Suit | 751 Labor - Family and Medical Leave Act |
Cause | 29:2601 Violation of the Family and Medical Leave Act |
Case Filed: | Jul 16, 2024 |
Last checked: Saturday Aug 31, 2024 5:49 AM EDT |
defendant
LG Energy Solution Michigan, Inc.
a Delaware corporation 1 LG Way
Holland, MI 49423 |
Represented By
|
plaintiff
Rebekah Oum
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 11 hours ago |
Tuesday, August 13, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
4
pgs
order
Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference by Telephone
Tue 08/13 1:11 PM
ORDER setting Rule 16 scheduling conference by telephone: telephone Rule 16 scheduling conference set for 9/11/2024 at 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Ray Kent; status report due by 9/6/2024; signed by Magistrate Judge Ray Kent (fhw) |
|
Wednesday, August 07, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
notice
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Wed 08/07 3:36 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by LG Energy Solution Michigan, Inc. (Ryan, Linda) |
|
5 | 5
answer
Answer to Complaint
Wed 08/07 3:28 PM
ANSWER to complaint1 with affirmative defenses and jury demand by LG Energy Solution Michigan, Inc. (Ryan, Linda) |
|
notice
Attorney Appearance
Wed 08/07 3:37 PM
(NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Emily M. Petroski on behalf of defendant LG Energy Solution Michigan, Inc. (Petroski, Emily) |
||
Wednesday, July 17, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
service
Summons Issued
Wed 07/17 8:16 AM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to defendant LG Energy Solution Michigan, Inc. (ns) |
|
Tuesday, July 16, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
service
Proposed Summons (to be issued)
Tue 07/16 4:20 PM
PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued re1 (Glazier, Bradley) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Notice Regarding Assignment of Case
Tue 07/16 2:13 PM
NOTICE that this case has been assigned to Paul L. Maloney (ns) |
|
1 | 1
8
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Tue 07/16 10:02 AM
COMPLAINT with jury demand against LG Energy Solution Michigan, Inc. filed by Rebekah Oum (Glazier, Bradley) Modified text on 7/16/2024 (ns) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 3 | ||
misc
Filing Fee (Civil Case) - Credit Card Payment
Tue 07/16 10:08 AM
FILING FEE PAID re1 by plaintiff Rebekah Oum in the amount of $405, receipt number AMIWDC-7428101 (Glazier, Bradley) |
||
notice
Attorney Appearance
Tue 07/16 10:28 AM
(NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Robert Michael Howard on behalf of plaintiff Rebekah Oum (Howard, Robert) |
||
service
Summons Not Issued
Tue 07/16 2:15 PM
SUMMONS NOT ISSUED as to defendant LG Energy Solution Michigan, Inc. ; none provided. (ns) |