Sanders v. Cook et al
Tennessee Middle District Court | |
Judge: | Aleta A Trauger |
Case #: | 3:24-cv-00857 |
Nature of Suit | 350 Torts - Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle |
Cause | 28:1441 Notice of Removal- Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | Jul 16, 2024 |
Terminated: | Aug 29, 2024 |
Case in other court: | Davidson County Circuit Court, 24C978 |
Last checked: Saturday Aug 31, 2024 7:50 AM CDT |
Defendant
Gary Adam Cook
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Global Frontline Logistics, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Anthony S. Sanders
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/06/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Thursday, August 29, 2024 | ||
13 | 13
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Thu 08/29 11:51 AM
STIPULATION of Dismissal AND PROPOSED ORDER OF DISMISSAL by Global Frontline Logistics, Inc..(Tarpley, John) |
|
Att: 1 Attachment PROPOSED ORDER OF DISMISSAL | ||
utility
Terminate Civil Case
Thu 08/29 1:53 PM
***Civil Case Terminated per13 . No order to enter. (am) |
||
Friday, August 23, 2024 | ||
12 | 12
1
pgs
order
Order 1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings
Fri 08/23 10:25 AM
ORDER: The court has been notified that this case has settled. It is hereby ORDERED that a stipulation of dismissal or other settlement document shall be filed within thirty (30) days of the entry of this Order. The initial case management conference scheduled for November 4, 2024 is CANCELLED. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 8/23/2024. (am) |
|
Thursday, August 22, 2024 | ||
11 | 11
notice
Notice of Settlement
Thu 08/22 3:59 PM
NOTICE of Settlement by Global Frontline Logistics, Inc. (Tarpley, John) |
|
Friday, August 09, 2024 | ||
misc
Annotation - Bar Status
Fri 08/09 9:20 AM
TN State Bar status verified as active for John Roy Tarpley admitted to this court . (am) |
||
Thursday, August 08, 2024 | ||
10 | 10
misc
Business Entity Disclosure Statement
Thu 08/08 2:54 PM
BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Global Frontline Logistics, Inc.. (Tarpley, John) |
|
9 | 9
notice
Notice of Appearance
Thu 08/08 2:49 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by John Roy Tarpley on behalf of Global Frontline Logistics, Inc. (Tarpley, John) |
|
Monday, July 22, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
answer
Answer to Complaint
Mon 07/22 2:21 PM
ANSWER to Complaint by Gary Adam Cook.(Tarpley, John) |
|
Tuesday, July 16, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
notice
Notice of Case Management Conference
Tue 07/16 10:08 AM
NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference is set for 11/4/2024 at 01:00 PM in Chambers - Suite 6325 before District Judge Aleta A. Trauger. (kc) |
|
6 | 6
misc
Business Entity Disclosure Statement
Tue 07/16 9:08 AM
BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Gary Adam Cook. (Tarpley, John) |
|
5 | 5
misc
Business Entity Disclosure Statement
Tue 07/16 9:08 AM
BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Global Frontline Logistics, Inc.. (Tarpley, John) |
|
4 | 4
notice
Notice/Information re Consent of the Parties to MJ
Tue 07/16 9:03 AM
NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (kc) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Notice of Business Entity Disclosure Statement Filing Requirement
Tue 07/16 9:02 AM
NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (kc) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Notice of Admin Order 217
Tue 07/16 9:02 AM
NOTICE OF ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER NO. 217 to parties re obligation of counsel to keep Court apprised of current contact information. (kc) |
|
1 | 1
notice
Notice of Removal
Tue 07/16 9:01 AM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Gary Adam Cook from Davidson County Circuit Court, case number 24C978. ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ATNMDC-4120382)(kc) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A Complaint, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B Notice of Plaintiffs Attorney and to State Court, | ||
Att: 3 Attachment - Civil Cover Sheet | ||
misc
Annotation - Bar Status
Tue 07/16 9:05 AM
TN State Bar status verified as active for John Roy Tarpley, Jose M. Gonzalez-Linares admitted to this court . (kc) |