Barb v. Meta Platforms Inc. et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 4:22-md-03047
Lead case: 4:22-md-03047
California Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers |
Case #: | 4:24-cv-04229 |
Nature of Suit | 365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability |
Case Filed: | Jul 15, 2024 |
Last checked: Thursday Aug 29, 2024 3:03 AM PDT |
Defendant
Facebook Operations, LLC
|
|
Defendant
Facebook Payments Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Google LLC
|
|
Defendant
Instagram LLC
|
|
Defendant
Meta Platforms Inc.
One Hacker Way
Menlo Park, CA 94025 |
|
Defendant
Siculus, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Snap, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
YouTube, LLC
|
|
Plaintiff
Kayla S. Barb
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/06/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Tuesday, July 16, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
service
Summons Issued
Tue 07/16 8:38 AM
Summons Issued as to Facebook Operations, LLC, Facebook Payments Inc., Google LLC, Instagram LLC, Meta Platforms Inc., Siculus, Inc., Snap, Inc. (mcl, COURT STAFF) |
|
utility
Electronic Filing Error
Tue 07/16 8:36 AM
[LINK:Electronic filing error] . YouTube, LLC has been added to the docket as named in the Complaint. Filer is reminded to enter ALL parties as named in the Complaint. Corrected by Clerk's Office. No further action is necessary. Re:1 Complaint filed by Kayla S. Barb. (mcl, COURT STAFF) |
||
Monday, July 15, 2024 | ||
3 | 3 Case assigned to Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (ark, COURT STAFF) | |
2 | 2 Proposed Summons. (Verhine, E.) | |
1 | 1 9 pgs COMPLAINT of Plaintiff Kayla S. Barb against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 405, receipt number ACANDC-19616446.). Filed by Kayla S Barb.(Verhine, E.) | |
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
Cases associated: Create association to 4:22-md-03047-YGR. (mcl, COURT STAFF) | ||
utility
MDL Member Case
Tue 07/16 8:34 AM
DIRECT FILED MEMBER CASE OPENED: MDL 3047, Barb v. Meta Platforms Inc. et al, Opened in California Northern District as 24-cv-04229-YGR cc: JPMDL (mcl, COURT STAFF) |