Hammond v. Mental Health Association in Tulsa Inc
Oklahoma Western District Court | |
Judge: | Patrick R Wyrick |
Case #: | 5:24-cv-00709 |
Nature of Suit | 442 Civil Rights - Employment |
Cause | 42:2000 Job Discrimination (Age) |
Case Filed: | Jul 16, 2024 |
Case in other court: | Oklahoma County District Court, CJ-24-03963 |
Last checked: Saturday Aug 31, 2024 3:55 AM CDT |
Defendant
Mental Health Association in Tulsa Inc
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Theresa Hammond
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/11/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Friday, August 09, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
notice
Entry of Appearance
Fri 08/09 2:29 PM
ENTRY of Appearance by Leah M Roper on behalf of Theresa Hammond (Roper, Leah) |
|
8 | 8
misc
Docket
Fri 08/09 1:16 PM
OCTOBER STATUS AND SCHEDULING CONFERENCE DOCKET: Scheduling Conference set for 10/2/2024 09:30 AM in Courtroom 503 before Judge Patrick R Wyrick. Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan due by 9/25/2024. (ks) |
|
Wednesday, July 24, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
Wed 07/24 4:36 PM
ORDER granting6 Defendant's Motion to Withdraw as Counsel of Record. Attorney Courtney L Bru terminated. Signed by Judge Patrick R Wyrick on 7/24/2024. (ks) |
|
Tuesday, July 23, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
motion
Withdraw as Attorney
Tue 07/23 3:21 PM
MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Mental Health Association in Tulsa Inc. (Bru, Courtney) |
|
5 | 5
misc
Disclosure Statement - Corporate
Tue 07/23 1:55 PM
DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Mental Health Association in Tulsa Inc . (Lytle, Gregg) |
|
4 | 4
answer
Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal)
Tue 07/23 1:53 PM
ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Mental Health Association in Tulsa Inc.(Lytle, Gregg) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Entry of Appearance
Tue 07/23 1:52 PM
ENTRY of Appearance by Gregg J Lytle on behalf of Mental Health Association in Tulsa Inc (Lytle, Gregg) |
|
Tuesday, July 16, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
notice
Entry of Appearance
Tue 07/16 9:41 AM
ENTRY of Appearance by Courtney L Bru on behalf of Mental Health Association in Tulsa Inc (Bru, Courtney) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Notice of Removal
Tue 07/16 9:28 AM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Oklahoma County District Court, case number CJ-2024-3963 filed by Mental Health Association in Tulsa Inc.(naa) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Petition, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 - Summons, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 3 - EOA Pl, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit 4 - Docket Sheet, | ||
Att: 5 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
misc
Payment for a Civil Case
Tue 07/16 9:45 AM
PAYMENT FOR A CIVIL CASE Filing fee $ 405, receipt number AOKWDC-4474988. (Bru, Courtney) |