Maine District Court
Judge:John A Woodcock, Jr
Referred: John C Nivison
Case #: 1:24-cv-00254
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause28:1331 Federal Question: Other Civil Rights
Case Filed:Jul 16, 2024
Terminated:Dec 03, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Jan 12, 2025 4:17 AM EST
Defendant
CARIBOU UTILITIES DISTRICT
Represented By
FREDERICK F. COSTLOW
Richardson, Whitman, Large & Badger
contact info
Plaintiff
DAVID T MARRETT
495 GRANBY ROAD, #2
SOUTH HADLEY, MA 01075
Plaintiff
SANDY J MARRETT
495 GRANBY ROAD, #2
SOUTH HADLEY, MA 01075

GPO Dec 02 2024
ORDER ON MOTION TO DISMISS granting 9 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; dismissing without prejudice 11 Motion for Summary Judgment By JUDGE JOHN A. WOODCOCK, JR. (CCS)

Docket last updated: 1 hours ago
Tuesday, December 03, 2024
25 25 order Judgment Tue 12/03 12:42 PM
JUDGMENT of Dismissal By DEPUTY CLERK: Joanne McCue. (jam)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 02, 2024
24 24 32 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Order on Motion for Summary Judgment Mon 12/02 5:05 PM
ORDER ON MOTION TO DISMISS granting9 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; dismissing without prejudice11 Motion for Summary Judgment By JUDGE JOHN A. WOODCOCK, JR. (CCS)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 11, 2024
23 23 notice Notice of Change of Address Tue 11/12 9:34 AM
NOTICE of Change of Address by DAVID T MARRETT, SANDY J MARRETT(jam)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 email containing document for filing
Friday, September 20, 2024
22 22 4 pgs order Order on Motion to Stay Fri 09/20 3:08 PM
ORDER ON MOTION TO STAY MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT granting15 Motion to Stay Plaintiffs David and Sandy Marretts's Motion for Summary Judgment By JUDGE JOHN A. WOODCOCK, JR. (CCS)
Related: [-]
21 21 5 pgs order Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief 1 Fri 09/20 3:06 PM
ORDER ON MOTION FOR EXPEDITED CONSIDERATION dismissing12 Motion for Expedited Consideration By JUDGE JOHN A. WOODCOCK, JR. (CCS)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 17, 2024
20 20 respm Reply to Response to Motion Tue 09/17 9:56 AM
Plaintiff's Response to Defendant's Opposition to Plaintiff's Statement of Material Facts and Motion for Summary Judgment re11 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by DAVID T MARRETT, SANDY J MARRETT.(jam)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Appendix A: Notice of Water Disconnection,
Att: 2 Appendix B: CUD bill,
Att: 3 Appendix C: CUD bill,
Att: 4 Appendix D: CUD bill,
Att: 5 Appendix E: CUD Water Quality Report,
Att: 6 Appendix F: Aroostook Savings & Loan letter,
Att: 7 Appendix G: Soldier On letter,
Att: 8 email containing docs for filing
Monday, September 16, 2024
19 19 misc Response to Statement of Fact Mon 09/16 11:45 AM
RESPONSE to Statement of Fact filed by CARIBOU UTILITIES DISTRICT.(COSTLOW, FREDERICK)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit Attachment 1 - Affidavit of Sue Sands in Support of Opposition to Plaintiffs Statements of Material Facts
18 18 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Mon 09/16 11:41 AM
RESPONSE in Opposition re11 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by CARIBOU UTILITIES DISTRICT. Reply due by 9/30/2024. (COSTLOW, FREDERICK)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 10, 2024
17 17 respm Reply to Response to Motion Tue 09/10 2:28 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re15 MOTION to Stay ECF 11-Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment filed by CARIBOU UTILITIES DISTRICT. (COSTLOW, FREDERICK)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 28, 2024
16 16 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Thu 08/29 10:32 AM
Motion Opposing Defendant's Motion to Stay Motion for Summary Judgment re15 MOTION to Stay ECF 11-Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment filed by DAVID T MARRETT, SANDY J MARRETT. Reply due by 9/11/2024.(jam)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 email containing document for filing
15 15 motion Stay Wed 08/28 3:39 PM
MOTION to Stay ECF 11-Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment by CARIBOU UTILITIES DISTRICT Responses due by 9/18/2024. (COSTLOW, FREDERICK)
Related: [-]
14 14 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Wed 08/28 3:35 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re12 MOTION for Expedited Consideration filed by CARIBOU UTILITIES DISTRICT. Reply due by 9/11/2024. (COSTLOW, FREDERICK)
Related: [-]
13 13 respm Reply to Response to Motion Wed 08/28 3:31 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re9 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by CARIBOU UTILITIES DISTRICT. (COSTLOW, FREDERICK)
Related: [-]
Sunday, August 25, 2024
12 12 motion Miscellaneous Relief 1 Mon 08/26 9:21 AM
Plaintiff's MOTION for Expedited Consideration by DAVID T MARRETT, SANDY J MARRETT Responses due by 9/16/2024.(jam)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order,
Att: 2 email containing documents
11 11 motion Summary Judgment Mon 08/26 9:14 AM
MOTION for Summary Judgment by DAVID T MARRETT, SANDY J MARRETT Responses due by 9/16/2024.(jam)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order,
Att: 2 Appendix A Notice of Water Disconnection,
Att: 3 Appendix B Work Order,
Att: 4 Appendix C 3 yr Variable Rate Mtg,
Att: 5 Appendix D emails,
Att: 6 email containing docs for filing
Wednesday, August 21, 2024
10 10 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Wed 08/21 4:21 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re9 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by DAVID T MARRETT, SANDY J MARRETT. Reply due by 9/4/2024.(slg)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
9 9 motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Wed 08/21 12:55 PM
MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by CARIBOU UTILITIES DISTRICT Responses due by 9/11/2024.(COSTLOW, FREDERICK)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit EXH 1 - CUD Terms & Conditions 2nd Revision Effective 1 1-2012
Att: 2 Exhibit EXH 1A - CUD Terms & Conditions 4th Revision Effective 10 4-2021
Att: 3 Exhibit EXH 2 - MMA - Member Coverage Certificate 7 1-2021 thru 7-1-2022
Thursday, August 08, 2024
8 8 service Waiver of Service Executed Mon 08/12 1:06 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed CARIBOU UTILITIES DISTRICT waiver sent on 7/18/2024.Answer due by 9/16/2024. (jam)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 18, 2024
7 7 notice Notice (Other) Thu 07/18 2:21 PM
NOTICE of Defendant's address provided by Plaintiffs(jam)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 email containing document for filing
misc USM Service Form Thu 07/18 2:22 PM
USM Service Form 285 and appropriate Service Documents completed and given to the U.S. Marshal Service along with a copy of the Complaint and Order Directing Service. (jam)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 17, 2024
order Order for Service Wed 07/17 4:06 PM
ORDER FOR SERVICE: The plaintiff is directed to provide the full name(s) and address(es) for the defendant(s). After the plaintiff has done so, the Clerk is directed to prepare the necessary documents for service by the U.S. Marshal. The U.S. Marshal shall attempt service by waivers in the first instance. If no waiver(s) is/are timely returned, the Clerk is directed to prepare summons(es) for service by the U.S. Marshal in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (jam)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 16, 2024
5 5 ORDER granting3 Motion to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Costs. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (NIVISON, JOHN)
Related: [-]
4 4 NOTICE: Recently DAVID T MARRETT and SANDY J MARRETT filed a pleading in this Court without representation of an attorney. Information regarding representing yourself is available on the Court's website at[LINK:https://www.med.uscourts.gov/handout-self-represented-parties] including a Handout for Self-Represented Parties. This handout is intended for informational and practical purposes only and in no way takes the place of an attorney's legal advice, but it may provide some answers to procedural and general questions. ALSO NOTE: You are responsible for notifying the Court in writing of any changes to your mailing address or telephone number and of any change in status regarding representation by an attorney. (cc: pro se litigant) (cjd)
Related: [-]
3 3 motion Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Costs Tue 07/16 11:18 AM
MOTION to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Costs by DAVID T MARRETT, SANDY J MARRETT (cjd)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet Tue 07/16 11:16 AM
CIVIL COVER SHEET. (cjd)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 07/16 11:16 AM
COMPLAINT against CARIBOU UTILITIES DISTRICT with Jury Demand, filed by DAVID T MARRETT, SANDY J MARRETT. (Service of Process Deadline 10/15/2024)(cjd)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Appendix A-1 Marrett's Brief in Support of Motion for Leave to Amend and Supplement Counterclaim,
Att: 2 Appendix A-2 Marrett's First Amended Counterclaim,
Att: 3 Appendix B - Defendant's Perfunctory Motion,
Att: 4 Appendix C - Judge's Order,
Att: 5 Appendix D - Estimate Replacement Cost
notice Notice to Pro Se Re First Filing & Address Updates Tue 07/16 11:19 AM
NOTICE: Recently DAVID T MARRETT and SANDY J MARRETT filed a pleading in this Court without representation of an attorney. Information regarding representing yourself is available on the Court's website at[LINK:https://www.med.uscourts.gov/handout-self-represented-parties] including a Handout for Self-Represented Parties. This handout is intended for informational and practical purposes only and in no way takes the place of an attorney's legal advice, but it may provide some answers to procedural and general questions. ALSO NOTE: You are responsible for notifying the Court in writing of any changes to your mailing address or telephone number and of any change in status regarding representation by an attorney. (cc: pro se litigant) (cjd)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Costs Tue 07/16 12:09 PM
ORDER granting3 Motion to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Costs. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (NIVISON, JOHN)
Related: [-]