Thomas v. Walmart, Inc.
Maryland District Court | |
Judge: | Adam B Abelson |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-02047 |
Nature of Suit | 360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury |
Cause | 28:1441 Notice of Removal |
Case Filed: | Jul 16, 2024 |
Last checked: Saturday Aug 31, 2024 5:42 AM EDT |
Defendant
Walmart, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Connie Thomas
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/12/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Monday, September 09, 2024 | ||
17 | 17
3
pgs
order
Order for Settlement Conference
Mon 09/09 10:43 AM
ORDER Scheduling Settlement Conference for 2/27/2025 at 10:00 a.m. Signed by Magistrate Judge A. David Copperthite on 9/9/2024. (kk5s, Deputy Clerk) |
|
16 | 16
1
pgs
order
Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge
Mon 09/09 8:16 AM
ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge A. David Copperthite for settlement conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Adam B. Abelson on 9/9/2024. (bw5s, Deputy Clerk) |
|
Friday, September 06, 2024 | ||
15 | 15
order
Scheduling Order
Fri 09/06 4:21 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Status Report due by 2/13/2025. Signed by Magistrate Judge Adam B. Abelson on 9/6/2024. (bw5s, Deputy Clerk) |
|
14 | 14
misc
Status Report
Fri 09/06 2:01 PM
STATUS REPORT INITIAL JOINT by Walmart, Inc.(Dunn, Christopher) |
|
Thursday, August 29, 2024 | ||
13 | 13
6
pgs
order
Order
Thu 08/29 12:07 PM
ORDER re: Joint Status Report Due Date. Signed by Magistrate Judge Adam B. Abelson on 8/29/2024.(kb3s, Deputy Clerk) |
|
Att: 1 Informal Dispute Letter | ||
Wednesday, August 28, 2024 | ||
order
25 Pct Mag - ORDER: Consent to Proceed before Mag Judge
Wed 08/28 3:38 PM
PAPERLESS ORDER: In accordance with 28 USC 636(c), all parties have voluntarily consented to have Magistrate Judge Adam B Abelson conduct all further proceedings in this case, including trial and entry of final judgment, and conduct all post-judgment proceedings, with direct review by the Fourth Circuit Court of Appeals, if an appeal is filed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Adam B. Abelson on 8/28/2024. (kk5s, Deputy Clerk) |
||
Thursday, July 18, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
misc
Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement
Thu 07/18 2:05 PM
Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Walmart, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Walmart Inc., Other Affiliate Wal-Mart Associates, Inc., Other Affiliate Wal-Mart Stores East, LP, Other Affiliate Wal-Mart Transportation, LLC, Other Affiliate Wal-Mart Real Estate Business Trust, Other Affiliate Wal-Mart Louisiana, LLC, Other Affiliate Wal-Mart.com USA, LLC, Other Affiliate Beaver Lake Aviation, Inc., Other Affiliate Claims Management, Inc., Other Affiliate ASDA Group Limited, Other Affiliate Bharti Walmart Private Limited, Other Affiliate Central American Retail Holding Company N.V., Other Affiliate Corporacion de Companias Agroindustriales, Other Affiliate Texas Retail Energy, LLC, Other Affiliate The Seiyu, Ltd., Other Affiliate Wal-Mart Argentina S.R.L., Other Affiliate Wal-Mart Brasil, Ltda., Other Affiliate Wal-mart Canada Corp., Other Affiliate Wal-mart China Co., Ltd., Other Affiliate Walmart de Mexico, S.A. de C.V., Other Affiliate Wal-Mart Leasing, Inc., Other Affiliate Wal-Mart Puerto Rico, Inc., Other Affiliate Wal-Mart Stores Texas, LLC, Other Affiliate Wal-Mart Stores Arkansas, LLC, Other Affiliate WMS Supermercados do Brasil, S.A. (formerly Sonae Distribuicao Brasil S.A.), Other Affiliate Corporacion de Supermercados Unidos S.A.; Distributiion y Servicio D&S S.A., Other Affiliate La Fruga S.A.; Massmart Holding Ltd., Other Affiliate Sam's East, Inc.; Sam's Real Estate Business Trust; Sam's West, Inc. for Walmart, Inc..(Dunn, Christopher) |
|
8 | 8
respm
Response
Thu 07/18 1:45 PM
RESPONSE re4 Amended Standing Order 2021-13 Concerning Removal Actions filed by Walmart, Inc..(Dunn, Christopher) |
|
Tuesday, July 16, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
order
25 Pct Mag - Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Order
Tue 07/16 2:19 PM
Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Adam B. Abelson on 7/16/2024. (ar6s, Deputy Clerk) |
|
4 | 4
notice
Amended Standing Order 2021-13 Concerning Removal Actions
Tue 07/16 2:18 PM
Clerk's Notice of Standing Order concerning removal actions filed in this Court, which can be downloaded[LINK:here] . (ar6s, Deputy Clerk) |
|
3 | 3
answer
Answer to Complaint
Tue 07/16 2:15 PM
ANSWER to2 STATE COURT Complaint by Walmart, Inc.(ar6s, Deputy Clerk) |
|
2 | 2
3
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Tue 07/16 2:14 PM
STATE COURT COMPLAINT against Walmart, Inc., filed by Connie Thomas.(ar6s, Deputy Clerk) |
|
1 | 1
notice
Notice of Removal
Tue 07/16 12:24 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court for Anne Arundel County, case number C-02-cv-24-001670. ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number AMDDC-11375348), filed by Walmart Inc..(Dunn, Christopher) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Summons Walmart Inc., | ||
Att: 3 Complaint State Court, | ||
Att: 4 State Court Answer, | ||
Att: 5 State Court Notice of Removal | ||
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Tue 07/16 1:20 PM
Case Assigned to Magistrate Judge Adam B. Abelson. (jf3s, Deputy Clerk) |
||
notice
Notice (Other)
Tue 07/16 2:17 PM
THE DOCUMENTS ABOVE (2) AND (3) ARE COPIES OF ORIGINAL PAPERS FILED IN THE CIRCUIT COURT FOR ANNE ARUNDEL COUNTY. (ar6s, Deputy Clerk) |
||
notice
25 Pct Mag - Notice of Case Assignment to a Magistrate Judge
Tue 07/16 2:20 PM
NOTICE of Case Assignment. This case has been assigned to Magistrate Judge Adam B. Abelson. Connie Thomas or counsel for Connie Thomas are required to review and comply with the Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Procedures which can be downloaded[LINK:here] . Pursuant to Standing Order 2019-07, which can be downloaded[LINK:here] , counsel has 14 days from the date of this notice to file their consent, or decline to consent to proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded[LINK:here] . To file your consent, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge . To file your declination, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Decline to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge . Failure to file a consent or declination will result in issuance of an Order to Show Cause. Please review the case management order that has been issued in this case. Magistrate Election Form due by 7/30/2024. (ar6s, Deputy Clerk) |
||
notice
25 Pct Mag - Notice of Case Assignment to a Magistrate Judge
Tue 07/16 2:20 PM
NOTICE of Case Assignment. This case has been assigned to Magistrate Judge Adam B. Abelson. Walmart, Inc. or counsel for Walmart, Inc. are required to review and comply with the Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Procedures which can be downloaded[LINK:here] . Pursuant to Standing Order 2019-07, which can be downloaded[LINK:here] , counsel has 14 days from the date of this notice to file their consent, or decline to consent to proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded[LINK:here] . To file your consent, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge . To file your declination, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Decline to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge . Failure to file a consent or declination will result in issuance of an Order to Show Cause. Please review the case management order that has been issued in this case. Magistrate Election Form due by 7/30/2024. (ar6s, Deputy Clerk) |