Hollin v. Herbert et al
Minnesota District Court | |
Judge: | Nancy E Brasel |
Referred: | Dulce J Foster |
Case #: | 0:24-cv-02716 |
Nature of Suit | 850 Other Statutes - Securities/Commodities/Exchange |
Cause | 15:78m(a) Securities Exchange Act |
Case Filed: | Jul 16, 2024 |
Last checked: Saturday Aug 31, 2024 3:42 AM CDT |
Defendant
Charisse Y. Sparks
|
|
Defendant
Dana G. Mead, Jr.
|
|
Defendant
Inspire Medical Systems, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Timothy P. Herbert
|
|
Defendant
Casey M. Tansey
|
|
Defendant
Shelly G. Broader
|
|
Defendant
Marilyn Carlson Nelson
|
|
Defendant
Shawn T. McCormick
|
|
Defendant
Jerry C. Griffin
|
|
Defendant
Georgia Garinois-Melenikiotou
|
|
Defendant
Gary L. Ellis
|
|
Defendant
Cynthia B. Burks
|
|
Defendant
Richard J. Buchholz
|
|
Plaintiff
Lawrence Hollin
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/15/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Friday, September 06, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
notice
Notice re: Non-Admitted Attorney
Fri 09/06 2:38 PM
(Text-Only) Notice re: Non-Admitted Attorney We have received documents listing Seth D. Rigrodsky, Vincent A. Licata as counsel of record. If he or she wishes to be listed as an attorney of record in this case, he or she must be admitted to the bar of the U.S. District Court of Minnesota in accordance with [LINK:Local Rule 83.5 (a), (b) and (c)] or temporarily admitted pro hac vice in accordance with [LINK:Local Rule 83.5 (d) or (e)] . For more admissions information and forms, please see the Attorney Forms Section of the courts website at [LINK:www.mnd.uscourts.gov/forms/all-forms] [LINK:. (LTT) |
|
Thursday, September 05, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
motion
Dismiss/General
Thu 09/05 9:25 PM
MOTION to Dismiss/General MOTION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER FOR VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL filed by Lawrence Hollin. (Altman, Adam) |
|
Friday, July 26, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
2
pgs
order
Order Reassigning Case
Mon 07/29 2:34 PM
ORDER OF REASSIGNMENT OF RELATED CASES. This case is reassigned to Judge Nancy E. Brasel and Magistrate Judge Dulce J. Foster for all further proceedings. Judge Eric C. Tostrud, Magistrate Judge John F. Docherty no longer assigned to case. NOTE: the new case number is 24-cv-2716 (NEB/DJF) . Please use this case number for all subsequent pleadings Signed by Judge Nancy E. Brasel on 7/16/2024 and Judge Eric C. Tostrud on 7/26/2024.(MKB) |
|
Tuesday, July 16, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
service
Summons Issued - Non-Standard
Tue 07/16 2:23 PM
Summons Issued as to Richard J. Buchholz, Inspire Medical Systems, Inc. (Nominal Defendant), Charisse Y. Sparks. (ABR) |
|
4 | 4
service
Summons Issued - Non-Standard
Tue 07/16 2:21 PM
Summons Issued as to Shelly G. Broader, Cynthia B. Burks, Gary L. Ellis, Georgia Garinois-Melenikiotou, Jerry C. Griffin, Timothy P. Herbert, Shawn T. McCormick, Dana G. Mead, Jr, Marilyn Carlson Nelson, Casey M. Tansey. (ABR) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Notice re: Non-Admitted Attorney
Tue 07/16 2:18 PM
(Text-Only) Notice re: Non-Admitted Attorney We have received documents listing Timothy J. MacFall, Samir Aougab, Joshua H. Grabar as counsel of record. If he or she wishes to be listed as an attorney of record in this case, he or she must be admitted to the bar of the U.S. District Court of Minnesota in accordance with [LINK:Local Rule 83.5 (a), (b) and (c)] or temporarily admitted pro hac vice in accordance with [LINK:Local Rule 83.5 (d) or (e)] . For more admissions information and forms, please see the Attorney Forms Section of the courts website at [LINK:www.mnd.uscourts.gov/forms/all-forms] [LINK:. (ABR) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Notice of Initial Case Assignment
Tue 07/16 2:16 PM
(Text-Only) CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Eric C. Tostrud per Civil (3rd, 4th - Antitrust, Securities) list, referred to Magistrate Judge John F. Docherty. Please use case number 24-cv-2716 (ECT/JFD). Notice: All Nongovernmental Corporate Parties must file a Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement. (ABR) |
|
1 | 1
50
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Tue 07/16 11:55 AM
COMPLAINT against Shelly G. Broader, Richard J. Buchholz, Cynthia B. Burks, Gary L. Ellis, Georgia Garinois-Melenikiotou, Jerry C. Griffin, Timothy P Herbert, Inspire Medical Systems, Inc., Shawn T. McCormick, Dana G. Mead, Marilyn Carlson Nelson, Charisse Y. Sparks, Casey M. Tansey (filing fee $ 405, receipt number AMNDC-11194438) filed by Lawrence Hollin. Filer requests summons issued. (Altman, Adam) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |