EAST PENN MANUFACTURING CO. v. SU
Pennsylvania Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Jeffrey L Schmehl |
Case #: | 5:24-cv-03077 |
Nature of Suit | 370 Torts - Personal Property - Other Fraud |
Cause | 28:1331 Fed. Question |
Case Filed: | Jul 16, 2024 |
Last checked: Saturday Aug 31, 2024 5:53 AM EDT |
Defendant
JULIE SU
|
|
Plaintiff
EAST PENN MANUFACTURING CO.
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/06/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Thursday, September 05, 2024 | ||
13 | 13
respm
Response to Motion
Thu 09/05 4:57 PM
RESPONSE to Motion re12 MOTION to Stay Pending Third Circuit Decision filed by EAST PENN MANUFACTURING CO..(HUYETT, DANIEL) |
|
Att: 1 Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Stay, | ||
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit - DI #49 Letter to Counsel, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit - Letter to US DOJ (dated 8/14/2024), | ||
Att: 5 Certificate of Service | ||
Wednesday, September 04, 2024 | ||
12 | 12
motion
Stay
Wed 09/04 5:07 PM
MOTION to Stay Pending Third Circuit Decision filed by JULIE SU.Memorandum, Certificate of Service.(COYNE, ELIZABETH) |
|
Thursday, July 25, 2024 | ||
11 | 11
service
Affidavit of Service
Thu 07/25 4:31 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Service by Peter J. Adonizio, Jr. re: served Complaint, Summons, Civil Cover Sheet and Designation Form upon Hon. Merrick B. Garland, Jacqueline C. Romero and Julie Su by certified mail on 7/17/2024 (HUYETT, DANIEL) |
|
10 | 10
service
Acceptance of Service by U.S. Attorney
Thu 07/25 11:31 AM
Acceptance of Service by U.S. Attorney Re: accepted summons and complaint on behalf of the United States Attorney (only). (JL) |
|
Tuesday, July 23, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
motion
Pro Hac Vice (Credit Card Payment)
Tue 07/23 11:03 AM
MOTION for Pro Hac Vice of Perie Reiko Koyama ( Filing fee $ 75 receipt number APAEDC-17618872.) filed by EAST PENN MANUFACTURING CO..Declaration/Certificate of Service.(KLEINMAN, KENNETH) |
|
Thursday, July 18, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice (Credit Card Payment)
Thu 07/18 12:24 PM
ORDER OF 7/18/24 THAT THE APPLICATION OF EVANGELINE C. PASCHAL, TO PRACTICE IN THIS COURT PURSUANT TO LRCP 83.5.2(b) IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY JUDGE: JEFFREY L. SCHMEHL ON 7/18/24. 7/18/24 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (DT) |
|
7 | 7
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice (Credit Card Payment)
Thu 07/18 12:22 PM
ORDER OF 7/18/24 THAT THE APPLICATION OF TONYA GRAY TO PRACTICE IN THIS COURT PURSUANT TO LRCP 83.5.2(b) IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY JUDGE: JEFFREY L. SCHMEHL ON 7/18/24. 7/18/24 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (DT) |
|
6 | 6
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice (Credit Card Payment)
Thu 07/18 12:19 PM
ORDER OF 7/18/24 THAT THE APPLICATION OF MICHAEL J. MUELLER TO PRACTICE IN THIS COURT PURSUANT TO LRCP 83.5.2(b) IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY JUDGE: JEFFREY L. SCHMEHL ON 7/18/24. 7/18/24 ENTERED AND COPIES M E-MAILED.(DT) |
|
Wednesday, July 17, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
motion
Pro Hac Vice (Credit Card Payment)
Wed 07/17 4:09 PM
MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Evangeline C. Paschal ( Filing fee $ 75 receipt number APAEDC-17607936.) filed by EAST PENN MANUFACTURING CO..Declaration/Certificate of Service.(KLEINMAN, KENNETH) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration Declaration | ||
4 | 4
motion
Pro Hac Vice (Credit Card Payment)
Wed 07/17 4:05 PM
MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Michael J. Mueller ( Filing fee $ 75 receipt number APAEDC-17607911.) filed by EAST PENN MANUFACTURING CO..Declaration/Certificate of Service.(KLEINMAN, KENNETH) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration Declaration | ||
3 | 3
motion
Pro Hac Vice (Credit Card Payment)
Wed 07/17 3:56 PM
MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Tonya Gray ( Filing fee $ 75 receipt number APAEDC-17607835.) filed by EAST PENN MANUFACTURING CO..Declaration/Certificate of Service.(KLEINMAN, KENNETH) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration Declaration | ||
Tuesday, July 16, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
service
Summons Issued as to USA
Tue 07/16 3:52 PM
Summons Issued as to JULIE SU, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General Forwarded To: Counsel on 7/16/24 (dt) |
|
1 | 1
14
pgs
cmp
Complaint (Attorney)
Tue 07/16 12:59 PM
COMPLAINT against JULIE SU ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number APAEDC-17603457.), filed by EAST PENN MANUFACTURING CO..(HUYETT, DANIEL) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Designation Form, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit A - Employment Discrimination Complaint, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit B - Final Agency Decision |