Bruey v. Cutwright
West Virginia Southern District Court | |
Judge: | David A Faber |
Referred: | Omar J Aboulhosn |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-00354 |
Nature of Suit | 530 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - General |
Cause | 28:2241 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (federal) |
Case Filed: | Jul 16, 2024 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 11 hours ago |
Wednesday, August 28, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
2
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings
Wed 08/28 10:35 AM
ORDER AND NOTICE directing Petitioner to file a Reply to the7 Response to Order to Show Cause on or before 9/30/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Omar J. Aboulhosn on 8/28/2024. (cc: Petitioner, pro se and counsel of record) (arb) |
|
Tuesday, August 27, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
respm
Response To Court Order
Tue 08/27 10:36 AM
RESPONSE by Cutwright to the Court's5 Order to Show Cause,.(Bailey, Jason) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 | ||
Wednesday, July 31, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
misc
Return Receipt Card (Generic)
Wed 07/31 10:41 AM
RETURN RECEIPT CARD received from United States Attorney on 7/30/2024 re:5 Order. (arb) |
|
Monday, July 22, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
2
pgs
order
Order to Show Cause
Mon 07/22 10:26 AM
ORDER directing Respondent to file an Answer to the1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (2241) by 8/30/2024 showing cause, if any, why the relief sought should not be granted. Petitioner may file a Reply to Respondent's Answer by 9/30/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Omar J. Aboulhosn on 7/22/2024. (cc: Petitioner, pro se; Respondent and USA w/2241 Petition) (arb) |
|
Att: 1 Warden Cutwright Certified Mail Receipt, | ||
Att: 2 U. S. Attorney Certified Mail Receipt | ||
Friday, July 19, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Filing Fee Received
Fri 07/19 2:43 PM
Filing Fee: $5.00, Receipt Number 2002767. (mk) |
|
Wednesday, July 17, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
order
Mag. Judge Aboulhosn - Standing Order For Assignment And Referral of Civil Actions And Matters
Wed 07/17 8:50 AM
STANDING ORDER IN RE: ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL OF CIVIL ACTIONS AND MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES ENTERED JANUARY 4, 2016. This case is referred to Magistrate Judge Omar J. Aboulhosn for Findings of Fact and Recommendations for disposition. (cc: counsel of record and any pro se party) (klc) |
|
Tuesday, July 16, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
notice
Notice (Other)
Tue 07/16 3:49 PM
NOTICE to Petitioner of Failure to Remit Filing Fee. (arb) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Petition For Writ Of Habeas Corpus (2241)
Tue 07/16 2:53 PM
PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS by Amber Rewis Bruey against Warden Cutwright pursuant to Title 28, United States Code, Section 2241. (arb) |
|
Att: 1 Cover Page - Attachments, | ||
Att: 2 Attachment 1, | ||
Att: 3 Attachment 2, | ||
Att: 4 Attachments 3 - 5, | ||
Att: 5 Attachment 6, | ||
Att: 6 Attachments 7 - 17, | ||
Att: 7 Attachment 18, | ||
Att: 8 Attachments 19 - 20, | ||
Att: 9 Attachment 21, | ||
Att: 10 Attachment 22, | ||
Att: 11 Attachment 23, | ||
Att: 12 Attachment 24, | ||
Att: 13 Attachment 25, | ||
Att: 14 Attachment 26, | ||
Att: 15 Attachment 27, | ||
Att: 16 Attachment 28, | ||
Att: 17 Attachment 29, | ||
Att: 18 Attachment 30, | ||
Att: 19 Attachment 31, | ||
Att: 20 Attachment 32, | ||
Att: 21 Attachment 33, | ||
Att: 22 Attachment 34, | ||
Att: 23 Attachment 35, | ||
Att: 24 Attachment 36, | ||
Att: 25 Envelope | ||
utility
Case Assigned
Wed 07/17 8:41 AM
CASE assigned to Senior Judge David A. Faber. (klc) |