Dhawan-Maloney v. USCIS
Minnesota District Court | |
Judge: | Paul A Magnuson |
Referred: | Tony N Leung |
Case #: | 0:24-cv-02717 |
Nature of Suit | 895 Other Statutes - Freedom of Information Act |
Cause | 05:552 Freedom of Information Act |
Case Filed: | Jul 16, 2024 |
Last checked: Saturday Aug 31, 2024 3:43 AM CDT |
Defendant
USCIS
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Evangeline Dhawan-Maloney
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/06/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Tuesday, August 13, 2024 | ||
10 | 10
service
Certificate of Service
Tue 08/13 3:58 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Evangeline Dhawan-Maloney (Dhawan-Maloney, Evangeline) |
|
9 | 9
misc
Letter to Magistrate Judge
Tue 08/13 2:05 PM
LETTER TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE by USCIS Regarding service . |
|
8 | 8
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 08/13 1:36 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Liles Harvey Repp on behalf of USCIS. |
|
Wednesday, July 17, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
1
pgs
order
Order of Recusal
Wed 07/17 1:05 PM
ORDER OF RECUSAL. Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright recused. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung for all further proceedings. NOTE: the new case number is 24-cv-2717 PAM/TNL . Please use this case number for all subsequent pleadings. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright on 7/17/2024. (ACH) |
|
Tuesday, July 16, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
service
Affidavit of Service
Tue 07/16 2:56 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Service by Evangeline Dhawan-Maloney (Dhawan-Maloney, Evangeline) |
|
5 | 5
service
Summons Issued
Tue 07/16 1:06 PM
Summons Issued as to USCIS. (ACH) |
|
4 | 4
notice
Notice of Initial Case Assignment
Tue 07/16 1:05 PM
(Text-Only) CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Paul A. Magnuson per Civil (3rd, 4th - Master) list, referred to Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright. Please use case number 24-cv-2717 PAM/ECW. Notice: All Nongovernmental Corporate Parties must file a Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement. (ACH) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 07/16 12:57 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Evangeline Surya Ester Dhawan-Maloney on behalf of Evangeline Dhawan-Maloney. (Dhawan-Maloney, Evangeline) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet
Tue 07/16 12:54 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET re1 Complaint, filed by United States Citizenship and Immigration Services filed by Evangeline Dhawan-Maloney. (Dhawan-Maloney, Evangeline) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Tue 07/16 12:54 PM
COMPLAINT against United States Citizenship and Immigration Services (filing fee $ 405, receipt number AMNDC-11194671) filed by Evangeline Dhawan-Maloney. Filer requests summons issued. (Dhawan-Maloney, Evangeline) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit(s) |