DOWNS v. WALMART INC.
New Jersey District Court | |
Judge: | Michael A Shipp |
Referred: | Tonianne J Bongiovanni |
Case #: | 3:24-cv-07793 |
Nature of Suit | 442 Civil Rights - Employment |
Cause | 28:1441 Notice of Removal - Employment Discrim |
Case Filed: | Jul 16, 2024 |
Case in other court: | SUPERIOR COURT OF NEW JERSEY, MERCER COUNTY, MER L 1161 24 |
Last checked: Saturday Aug 31, 2024 6:37 AM EDT |
Defendant
WALMART INC.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
ABC CORPS 1-10
|
|
Defendant
JOHN DOES 1-10
|
|
Defendant
JOHN ROES 1-10
|
|
Plaintiff
BETHANY DOWNS
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 11 hours ago |
Tuesday, August 20, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 08/20 10:31 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by CORMAC EGENTON on behalf of BETHANY DOWNS (EGENTON, CORMAC) |
|
Monday, August 19, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
answer
Answer to Complaint
Mon 08/19 2:32 PM
Defendant's ANSWER to Complaint by WALMART INC..(LILES, LATIQUA) |
|
Wednesday, August 07, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
discov
Joint Discovery Plan
Wed 08/07 3:26 PM
Joint Discovery Plan by WALMART INC..(HANSEN, LUIS) |
|
Thursday, August 01, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
misc
Application for Clerk Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order
Thu 08/01 2:02 PM
Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer Attorney LATIQUA LILES for WALMART INC. added. (LILES, LATIQUA) |
|
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Appearance
Thu 08/01 1:53 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by LATIQUA LILES on behalf of WALMART INC. (LILES, LATIQUA) |
|
utility
Update Answer Due Deadline
Thu 08/01 4:07 PM
Clerk`s Text Order - The6 Application for A Clerk's Order Extending Time to Answer submitted by WALMART INC., on 8/1/2024 has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 8/20/2024. (kht) |
||
Wednesday, July 24, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
4
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Set Hearings ~Util - Set/Clear Flags
Wed 07/24 11:39 AM
ORDER SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Scheduling Conference set for 9/10/2024 at 11:00 AM in Trenton - Courtroom 6E before Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni on 7/24/2024. (jem) |
|
Wednesday, July 17, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement (aty)
Wed 07/17 1:07 AM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by WALMART INC. identifying WALMART INC. as Corporate Parent.. (HANSEN, LUIS) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Exhibit (to Document)
Wed 07/17 1:05 AM
Exhibit to1 Notice of Removal, Civil Cover Sheet by WALMART INC.. (HANSEN, LUIS) |
|
Tuesday, July 16, 2024 | ||
1 | 1
notice
Notice of Removal
Tue 07/16 1:19 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL by WALMART INC. from NJSuper.Ct. MER-L-001161-24, case number MER-L-1161-24. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 405 receipt number ANJDC-15520487), filed by WALMART INC..(HANSEN, LUIS) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 2 Certificate of Service | ||
qc
QC - Civil Cover Sheet JS44
Tue 07/16 2:26 PM
CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The case you electronically filed did not include a Civil Cover Sheet (JS-44), which is required to be submitted along with the initial pleading, as indicated in the Attorney Case Opening Guide. Please complete and file a[LINK:Civil Cover Sheet] using the event Exhibit (to Document) found under Civil/Other Filings/Other Documents. Please refer to the Attorney Case Opening Guide for processing electronically filed cases. (km) |
||
utility
Add and Terminate Judges
Tue 07/16 3:14 PM
Judge Michael A. Shipp and Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni added. (kht) |
||
qc
QC - Updating Account
Tue 07/16 3:19 PM
CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The1 Notice of Removal submitted by Luis Hansen on 7/16/2024 appears to have address information as to Plaintiff's attorney that does not match the court's records for this case. Please refer to the court's website at www.njd.uscourts.gov for information and instructions on maintaining your account. (kht) |
||
qc
QC - Lack of Corporate Disclosure Statement
Tue 07/16 3:40 PM
CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - Please be advised, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, a disclosure statement is required to be filed by a nongovernmental corporate party or intervenor. Please refer to the Court's website at[LINK:www.njd.uscourts.gov] for a form and filing instructions. (km) |