ROGERS v. KNIGHT et al
Indiana Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Holly A Brady |
Referred: | Susan L Collins |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-00292 |
Nature of Suit | 350 Torts - Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Petition for Removal |
Case Filed: | Jul 16, 2024 |
Case in other court: | Allen County Superior Court, 02D09-2405-CT-000357 |
Last checked: Saturday Aug 31, 2024 6:26 AM EDT |
Defendant
American West Worldwide Express, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Marvin C Knight
|
Represented By
|
Mediator
Kyle Baker
|
|
Plaintiff
Nautica I Rogers
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 11 hours ago |
Wednesday, July 31, 2024 | ||
14 | 14
order
Scheduling Order
Wed 07/31 2:58 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEMORANDUM OF PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: The Court sets the following deadlines pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b): The parties will exchange the information required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1) by 11/16/2024. The last date for the completion of all fact and expert discovery is 11/17/2025. The serving of reports from retained experts under Rule 26(a)(2) are due from Plaintiff by 7/16/2025; and from Defendants by 8/26/2025. Supplementation under Rule 26(e) due every six weeks until trial. The last date to seek leave of Court to amend the pleadings as to Plaintiff is 12/16/2024; as to Defendants is 2/16/2025. The deadline to file any dispositive motions is 12/17/2025, with any response due 28 days thereafter and any reply due 14 days after the filing of a response, consistent with Local Rule 56-1(b) and (c). The parties have agreed upon Kyle Baker as mediator. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins on 7/31/2024. (sej) |
|
13 | 13
minutes
Pretrial Conference - Preliminary - customized ddls & hrgs
Wed 07/31 1:18 PM
TELEPHONIC RULE 16 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE held on 7/31/2024 before Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins. Pla appeared by atty Daniel Gore. Dfts appeared by atty Matthew Phillips. Court addresses the amount in controversy in order to establish jurisdictional diversity. Court opens discovery for parties to determine the amount in damages. The12 Report of Parties' Planning Meeting is approved in all respects (except establishment of a trial date). Kyle Baker appointed as mediator. Atty Gore to notify mediator by letter, copy to atty Phillips. Magistrate Consent forms due by 8/21/2024. Telephonic Status Conference set for 10/30/2024 at 10:00 am to address the amount in controversy. To connect to the conference, Parties should dial 833-568-8864, enter meeting ID: 161 6325 2172#, push # to skip entry of participant ID and enter passcode 039039# at least five minutes before the conference start time. (FTR 1st floor.) (mr) |
|
Friday, July 26, 2024 | ||
12 | 12
misc
Report of Rule 26f Planning Meeting
Fri 07/26 2:21 PM
REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Hoy, Jason) |
|
Thursday, July 25, 2024 | ||
11 | 11
notice
Notice of Appearance
Thu 07/25 9:12 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew K Phillips on behalf of American West Worldwide Express, Inc., Marvin C Knight (Phillips, Matthew) |
|
Thursday, July 18, 2024 | ||
10 | 10
misc
Mag Consent Forms Sent - Standard with pptc - form will be generated
Thu 07/18 2:53 PM
MAGISTRATE JUDGE CONSENT FORMS sent to all parties. (mr) |
|
9 | 9
notice
Notice of Hearing/Deadlines
Thu 07/18 2:52 PM
NOTICE of Hearing: Telephonic Rule 16 Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 7/31/2024 at 11:30 AM in US District Court - Fort Wayne before Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins. To connect to the conference, Parties should dial 833-568-8864, enter meeting ID: 161 6325 2172#, push # to skip entry of participant ID and enter passcode 039039# at least five minutes before the conference start time. (mr) |
|
Wednesday, July 17, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
notice
Notice - Other
Wed 07/17 10:45 AM
NOTICE by Nautica I Rogers re1 Notice of Removal,,, Statement Responding to Notice of Removal (Gore, Daniel) |
|
7 | 7
notice
Notice of Appearance
Wed 07/17 10:41 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel Gore on behalf of Nautica I Rogers (Gore, Daniel) |
|
Tuesday, July 16, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Tue 07/16 3:27 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by AMERICAN WEST WORLDWIDE EXPRESS INC.. (Hoy, Jason) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 07/16 3:26 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher R Whitten on behalf of All Defendants (Whitten, Christopher) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 07/16 3:25 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Jason J Hoy on behalf of All Defendants (Hoy, Jason) |
|
1 | 1
notice
Notice of Removal
Tue 07/16 3:21 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL (Filing fee $ 405 receipt number AINNDC-5627701.) from Allen County Superior Court, Cause No. 02D09-2405-CT-000357, filed by AMERICAN WEST WORLDWIDE EXPRESS INC., MARVIN C KNIGHT.(Hoy, Jason) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Plaintiff's Responses to Defendants' Request for Admission, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Plaintiff's Appearances, Complaint for Damages, Summonses, Notice of Proof of Service, Motion to Substitute Counsel, Order on Motion to Substitute Counsel, Order for Case Management Conference, Defendants' Appearance, Motion for Extension of Time, Order on Motion for Extension of Time, and Answer, Affirmative Defenses and Jury Demand, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit Copy of Complaint for Damages, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit State Court docket, | ||
Att: 5 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet | ||
utility
Add and Terminate Judges
Wed 07/17 8:45 AM
Chief Judge Holly A Brady and Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins added. **NEW CASE** (mrm) |
||
Wednesday, July 10, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
answer
Answer to Complaint
Wed 07/17 8:35 AM
ANSWER to Complaint by Marvin C Knight. American West Worldwide Express, Inc.(mrm) |
|
Friday, May 31, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
cmp
State Court Complaint
Wed 07/17 8:31 AM
STATE COURT COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against American West Worldwide Express, Inc., Marvin C Knight, from Allen County Superior Court, Cause No. 02D09-2405-CT-000357, filed by Nautica I Rogers.(mrm) |