Alger v. Washington et al
Michigan Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Denise Page Hood |
Referred: | Kimberly G Altman |
Case #: | 2:24-cv-11827 |
Nature of Suit | 555 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Prison Condition |
Cause | No cause code entered |
Case Filed: | Jul 16, 2024 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 09/11/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Monday, September 09, 2024 | ||
10 | 10
notice
Change of Address/Contact Information
Wed 09/11 12:22 PM
NOTICE of Change of Address/Contact Information by Joshua Levi Alger. (JHea) |
|
Tuesday, September 03, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
order
Setting Pro Se Prisoner Early Mediation Conference*
Tue 09/03 12:46 PM
ORDER Setting Pro Se Prisoner Early Mediation Conference Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly G. Altman. (VLun) |
|
service
Certificate of Service
Tue 09/03 12:56 PM
TEXT-ONLY CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re9 Order Setting Pro Se Prisoner Early Mediation Conference on Joshua Levi Alger 376096, G. Robert Cotton Correctional Facility, 3500 N. Elm Road, Jackson, MI 49201 (VLun) |
||
Tuesday, August 27, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
misc
Attorney Appearance - Prisoner Mediation
Tue 08/27 8:21 AM
NOTICE of Limited Appearance by Austin C. Raines on behalf of Shane Campbell, DeRoeck, Johnson, Roark, Heidi Washington for the purposes of the Pro Se Prisoner Early Mediation Program. (Raines, Austin) |
|
Tuesday, August 20, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
notice
Change of Address/Contact Information
Tue 08/20 1:54 PM
NOTICE of Change of Address/Contact Information by Joshua Levi Alger. (JHea) |
|
Monday, August 19, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
order
Staying Case
Mon 08/19 3:20 PM
ORDER STAYING CASE and Referral to the Pro Se Prisoner Early Mediation Program. Signed by District Judge Denise Page Hood. (LSau) |
|
service
Certificate of Service
Mon 08/19 3:23 PM
TEXT-ONLY CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re6 Order Staying Case on Joshua Levi Alger Pris. No. 376096 at 2727 E Beecher Street, Adrian, MI 49221. (LSau) |
||
Wednesday, July 17, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
notice
Regarding Parties Responsibility to Notify Court of Address Changes*
Wed 07/17 8:19 AM
Notice Regarding Parties' Responsibility to Notify Court of Address Changes (SHic) |
|
Tuesday, July 16, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
1
pgs
order
Order on Application to Proceed Without Prepaying Fees or Costs
Tue 07/16 4:28 PM
ORDER granting2 Application to Proceed Without Prepaying Fees or Costs and Directing Payment of an Initial Partial Filing Fee in the amount of $8.59 and subsequent payments. Signed by Magistrate Judge David R. Grand. (JHea) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Mediation Program*
Tue 07/16 3:01 PM
NOTICE of Mediation Program (JHea) |
|
2 | 2
petition
Application to Proceed Without Prepaying Fees or Costs
Tue 07/16 3:01 PM
APPLICATION to Proceed Without Prepaying Fees or Costs by Joshua Levi Alger. (JHea) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Civil Case - Complaint
Tue 07/16 3:00 PM
COMPLAINT filed by Joshua Levi Alger against All Defendants (JHea) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |