United States of America v. $11,200.00 U.S. Currency
Mississippi Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Louis Guirola, Jr |
Referred: | Bradley W Rath |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-00220 |
Nature of Suit | 625 Forfeiture/Penalty - Drug Related Seizure of Property 21 USC 881 |
Cause | 21:881 Forfeiture Property-Drugs |
Case Filed: | Jul 16, 2024 |
Last checked: Saturday Aug 31, 2024 4:46 AM CDT |
Defendant
$11,200.00 U.S. Currency
|
|
Plaintiff
United States of America
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/11/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Wednesday, September 04, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
service
Certificate of Service
Wed 09/04 9:21 AM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by United States of America re1 Complaint,4 Notice (Other)(Baldwin-Federal Gov, Clay) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A -- Proof of Service | ||
5 | 5
service
Service by Publication
Wed 09/04 9:19 AM
SERVICE by Publication filed by United States of America. Last publication date 08/15/2024.(Baldwin-Federal Gov, Clay) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A -- Proof of Publication | ||
Tuesday, July 16, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS OR DISCOVERY
Tue 07/16 3:37 PM
NOTICE of Complaint for Forfeiture by United States of America re1 Complaint (Baldwin-Federal Gov, Clay) |
|
3 | 3
service
Warrant Issued
Tue 07/16 3:34 PM
Warrant of Arrest In Rem Issued as to $11,200.00 U.S. Currency. (wld) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Application for Warrant of Arrest in Rem
Tue 07/16 3:18 PM
APPLICATION WARRANT OF ARREST IN REM as to Defendant Property by United States of America (Baldwin-Federal Gov, Clay) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Tue 07/16 1:54 PM
COMPLAINT against $11,200.00 U.S. Currency, filed by United States of America.(wld) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A-Declaration of DEA TFO James E. Nix, | ||
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet |