Kitts Jr. v. ELI LILLY AND COMPANY
Pennsylvania Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Karen S Marston |
Case #: | 2:24-cv-03079 |
Nature of Suit | 367 Torts - Personal Injury - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury/Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability |
Case Filed: | Jul 16, 2024 |
Last checked: Saturday Aug 31, 2024 5:53 AM EDT |
Defendant
ELI LILLY AND COMPANY
|
|
Plaintiff
Richard Eddie Kitts Jr.
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/06/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Wednesday, July 17, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
service
Summons Issued
Wed 07/17 11:12 AM
Summons Issued as to ELI LILLY AND COMPANY. Forwarded To: EMAILED TO PLAINTIFFS COUNSEL on 7/17/2024 (sg) |
|
Tuesday, July 16, 2024 | ||
1 | 1
52
pgs
cmp
Complaint (Attorney)
Tue 07/16 2:26 PM
COMPLAINT against ELI LILLY AND COMPANY ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number APAEDC-17603768.), filed by Richard Eddie Kitts Jr..(PENNOCK, PAUL) (Attachment 1 replaced on 7/16/2024) (sbt) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Designation Form | ||
misc
MDL Member Case
Tue 07/16 3:16 PM
MDL-3094 (Judge MARSTON) Member Case. PAED. Case number in EDPA: 24-cv-3079. (sbt) |