Cain v. USA
Tennessee Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Thomas A Varlan |
Referred: | Jill E Mccook |
Case #: | 3:24-cv-00304 |
Nature of Suit | 510 Prisoner Petitions - Motions to Vacate Sentence |
Cause | 28:2255 Motion to Vacate / Correct Illegal Sentenc |
Case Filed: | Jul 16, 2024 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 11 hours ago |
Monday, August 19, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Mon 08/19 3:18 PM
ORDER granting 6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 1 Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255). For good cause shown, the government's motion [Doc. 6] is GRANTED. The government shall answer or otherwise respond to petitioner's motion no later than September 16, 2024 . Although a reply is not necessary, if petitioner wishes to file a reply, he shall file such reply within thirty (30) days from the date the government files its response. Signed by District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 8/19/2024. (SLM) (C/m to William Brian Cain) |
|
Friday, August 16, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
motion
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Fri 08/16 1:32 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to1 Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255) by USA. (Kolman, Jennifer) |
|
Wednesday, July 17, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
notice
Notice re Requirement to Notify Court of Change of Address
Wed 07/17 2:38 PM
Notice Regarding Requirement to Notify Court of Change of Address (JAN) |
|
4 | 4
2
pgs
order
Order
Wed 07/17 12:47 PM
ORDER re 1 Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255) filed by William Brian Cain. The United States Attorney is hereby ORDERED to file an answer or other pleading within thirty (30) days from the date of this Order. Signed by District Judge Thomas A Varlan on July 17, 2024. (JAN)(Copy mailed to dft) |
|
Tuesday, July 16, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
notice
Notice re Requirement to Notify Court of Change of Address
Tue 07/16 3:49 PM
Notice Regarding Requirement to Notify Court of Change of Address (JAN) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Notice re Requirement to Notify Court of Change of Address
Tue 07/16 3:45 PM
Notice Regarding Requirement to Notify Court of Change of Address (JAN) |
|
1 | 1
mot2255
Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255)
Tue 07/16 3:44 PM
MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence (2255), filed by William Brian Cain.(JAN) |
|
Att: 1 Other Inmate Account, | ||
Att: 2 Other Envelope |