Fleming v. Napier
South Carolina District Court | |
Judge: | Sherri A Lydon |
Referred: | Bristow Marchant |
Case #: | 8:24-cv-03972 |
Nature of Suit | 530 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - General |
Cause | 28:2241 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Federal) |
Case Filed: | Jul 16, 2024 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 11 hours ago |
Tuesday, August 13, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
misc
Filing Fee Received
Tue 08/13 1:40 PM
Filing fee: $ 5.00, receipt number 600010091. (jens) |
|
Friday, July 19, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
misc
Document Mailed
Fri 07/19 8:57 AM
***DOCUMENT MAILED5 Proper Form Order and IFP placed in U.S. Mail from Greenville Clerks Office to Demarcus D Fleming #08983-095, EDGEFIELD FEDERAL CORRECTIONAL INSTITUTION, Inmate Mail/Parcels, P.O. BOX 725, EDGEFIELD, SC 29824. (rweb, ) |
|
5 | 5
order
Proper Form Order
Fri 07/19 8:55 AM
PROPER FORM ORDER Case to be brought into proper form by 8/9/2024. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bristow Marchant on 7/19/24. (rweb, ) |
|
Tuesday, July 16, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
misc
True Division for Trial
Tue 07/16 2:42 PM
TRUE DIVISION FOR TRIAL: Anderson/Greenwood. (rweb, ) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus - 2254 or 2241
Tue 07/16 2:41 PM
PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Demarcus D Fleming.(rweb, ) |
|
Att: 1 Envelope |