Alex Hollis v. 3M Company Inc
Consolidated
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
South Carolina District Court | |
Judge: | Richard M Gergel |
Case #: | 2:24-cv-03977 |
Nature of Suit | 365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | Jul 16, 2024 |
Last checked: Saturday Aug 31, 2024 6:17 AM EDT |
Defendant
3M Company Inc
|
|
Plaintiff
Alex Hollis
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/16/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Tuesday, July 16, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
misc
MDL Member Case Opened
Tue 07/16 2:21 PM
MDL MEMBER CASE OPENED: (Direct-Filed)(associated as of 07/16/2024), Alex Hollis v. 3M Company Inc, as DSC case 2:24-cv-03977-RMG Plaintiff Home Venue: Northern Alabama (mbon) |
|
2 | 2
service
Summons Issued
Tue 07/16 2:20 PM
Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (mbon) |
|
1 | 1
34
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Tue 07/16 2:17 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ASCDC-11879227.), filed by Alex Hollis. Service due by 10/15/2024 (mbon) |