GASPA v. JAN'S BOUTIQUE, INC.
New Jersey District Court | |
Judge: | Renee Marie Bumb |
Referred: | Sharon A King |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-07806 |
Nature of Suit | 446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other |
Cause | 42:12101 Americans with Disabilities Act |
Case Filed: | Jul 16, 2024 |
Last checked: Saturday Aug 31, 2024 6:39 AM EDT |
Defendant
JAN'S BOUTIQUE, INC.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
VERONICA GASPA
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 11 hours ago |
Tuesday, September 03, 2024 | ||
utility
Add and Terminate Judges
Tue 09/03 9:20 AM
Magistrate Judge Sharon A. King added. Magistrate Judge Matthew J. Skahill no longer assigned to case. (mmb, ) |
||
Wednesday, August 28, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Letter
Wed 08/28 8:46 AM
Letter from Patrick Papalia, Esq.. (SEARS, SCOTT) |
|
6 | 6
notice
Notice of Appearance
Wed 08/28 8:35 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by SCOTT AVI SEARS on behalf of All Defendants (SEARS, SCOTT) |
|
Tuesday, August 27, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
order
Order on Motion to Dismiss
Tue 08/27 3:56 PM
ORDER terminating4 Motion to Dismiss This matter comes before the Court upon the filing of a motion to dismiss by Defendant Jan's Boutique, Inc. (Docket No. 4). The Court administratively terminates the motion as improperly filed. Pursuant to the Court's Individual Rules and Procedures I.A., a party seeking to file a motion to dismiss must file a premotion conference letter setting forth the basis for the anticipated motion with citations to relevant authority. Signed by Chief Judge Renee Marie Bumb on 08/27/2024. (Costigan, Roberta) |
|
4 | 4
motion
Dismiss
Tue 08/27 12:58 PM
MOTION to Dismiss by All Defendants. Responses due by 10/7/2024.(PAPALIA, PATRICK) |
|
Att: 1 Memorandum Memorandum in Support thereof, | ||
Att: 2 Certification Certification of Patrick Papalia, | ||
Att: 3 Text of Proposed Order Oroposed Order, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit Exhibit A to Certification of Patrick Papalia, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit Exhibit B to Certification of Patrick Papalia | ||
Friday, August 09, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
service
Summons Returned Executed
Fri 08/09 1:54 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by VERONICA GASPA. JAN'S BOUTIQUE, INC. served on 8/7/2024, answer due 8/28/2024. (HOROWITZ, URI) |
|
Thursday, July 18, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
service
Summons Issued
Thu 07/18 3:23 PM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to JAN'S BOUTIQUE, INC.. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (aji, ) |
|
notice
Notice of Judicial Preferences
Thu 07/18 3:23 PM
Notice of Judicial Preferences.[LINK:Click here] for the Judge's Individual Procedure Requirements. (aji, ) |
||
Tuesday, July 16, 2024 | ||
1 | 1
22
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Tue 07/16 2:58 PM
COMPLAINT against JAN'S BOUTIQUE, INC. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 405 receipt number ANJDC-15521053) with JURY DEMAND, filed by VERONICA GASPA.(HOROWITZ, URI) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Summons | ||
utility
Add and Terminate Judges
Thu 07/18 2:20 PM
Chief Judge Renee Marie Bumb and Magistrate Judge Matthew J. Skahill added. (dmw) |