Tartsah v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration et al
Oklahoma Western District Court | |
Judge: | Patrick R Wyrick |
Case #: | 5:24-cv-00713 |
Nature of Suit | 864 Social Security - SSID Title XVI |
Cause | 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (SSID) |
Case Filed: | Jul 16, 2024 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 10 hours ago |
Wednesday, September 04, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
notice
Entry of Appearance
Wed 09/04 6:31 AM
ENTRY of Appearance by Narissa C Webber on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security Administration (Webber, Narissa) |
|
Friday, July 19, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Fri 07/19 1:02 PM
ORDER granting2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shon T. Erwin on 7/19/2024. (mc) |
|
Thursday, July 18, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
order
~Util - Set/Clear Flags Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge
Thu 07/18 11:08 AM
ENTER ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Shon T. Erwin. Motions referred to Shon T. Erwin. Signed by the direction of Judge Patrick R Wyrick on 07/18/24. (rp) |
|
misc
Docket Annotation Case Assigned/Reassigned
Thu 07/18 11:04 AM
Docket Annotation: One or more parties did not consent to proceed before a Magistrate Judge. Pursuant to General Order 23-1 this case is assigned to District Judge Patrick R Wyrick. (rp) |
||
Tuesday, July 16, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
notice
Entry of Appearance
Tue 07/16 4:44 PM
ENTRY of Appearance by Miles L Mitzner on behalf of Alfred Tartsah (Mitzner, Miles) |
|
2 | 2
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Tue 07/16 4:01 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Alfred Tartsah. (naa) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint Social Security
Tue 07/16 3:59 PM
COMPLAINT (Social Security) against Commissioner of Social Security Administration filed by Alfred Tartsah.(naa) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |