Vose v. Enright et al
Rhode Island District Court | |
Judge: | John J Mcconnell, Jr |
Referred: | Patricia A Sullivan |
Case #: | 1:24-mc-00007 |
Case Filed: | Jul 16, 2024 |
Terminated: | Aug 01, 2024 |
Petitioner
Carlton Vose
|
|
Respondent
Karen Enright
|
|
Respondent
Providence County Superior Court
|
Docket last updated: 09/13/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Thursday, August 01, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
3
pgs
order
Order
Thu 08/01 11:47 AM
ORDER re1 Petition and2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis: The Court DENIES and DISMISSES the Petition and denies the I.F.P. Application as moot. So Ordered by Chief Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 8/1/2024. (Simoncelli, Michael) |
|
Wednesday, July 17, 2024 | ||
order
Order
Wed 07/17 2:20 PM
TEXT ORDER re:2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Carlton Vose: While the Court has in the docket of Case No. 24-cv-00119 a certified Inmate Account Statement from May 2024, nothing in 28 U.S.C. §1915(a)(2) gives the Court discretion to alter period which an inmate account statement must cover, which is the six months preceding the filing of the action. Therefore, Mr. Vose is hereby ordered to file a copy of his inmate account from the ACI within 30 days of entry of this order before the Court can rule on his motion to proceed without the payment of costs. So Ordered by Chief Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 7/17/2024. (Jackson, Ryan) |
||
Tuesday, July 16, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
4
pgs
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Tue 07/16 4:09 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Carlton Vose.(Gonzalez Gomez, Viviana) |
|
Att: 1 Envelope | ||
1 | 1
4
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Tue 07/16 4:08 PM
VERIFIED PETITION for RULE 27 ORDER and PRESERVATION ORDER, filed by Carlton Vose. (Gonzalez Gomez, Viviana) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Envelope | ||
utility
Case Conditionally Assigned
Tue 07/16 4:13 PM
CASE CONDITIONALLY ASSIGNED to Chief Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan. Related Case Number 23-cv-84 based upon the indication on the cover sheet that a related case previously was assigned to the presiding judge. The assignment is subject to the presiding judge's determination that the cases, in fact, are related. (Gonzalez Gomez, Viviana) |