Riley et al v. Slusher et al
Tennessee Middle District Court | |
Judge: | Aleta A Trauger |
Case #: | 3:24-cv-00860 |
Nature of Suit | 550 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Jul 16, 2024 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 09/06/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Friday, August 16, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
misc
Supplement
Fri 08/16 11:15 AM
SUPPLEMENT filed by Jose Bonelges Guillen Alonso re1 Complaint (in Spanish). (kc) |
|
7 | 7
misc
Supplement
Fri 08/16 11:14 AM
SUPPLEMENT filed by Aaron Samson Riley re1 Complaint.(kc) |
|
Att: 1 Attachment Grievances | ||
6 | 6
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Fri 08/16 11:11 AM
APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Jose Bonelges Guillen Alonso. (kc) |
|
Tuesday, July 30, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
2
pgs
order
Order
Tue 07/30 2:06 PM
ORDER: Aaron Samson Riley and Jose Bonelges Guillen Alonso, both inmates of the Davidson County Sheriff's Office in Nashville, Tennessee, filed a pro se complaint, alleging violations of their civil rights. (Doc. No.1 ). Additional action by Alonso is required. If Alonso wishes to be recognized as a co-plaintiff to this action, he MUST sign the complaint and return it to the court within 30 days. Here, Alonso has not submitted his portion of the civil filing fee or an application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis along with a certified inmate trust fund account statement. The Clerk is DIRECTED to mail Riley, for Alonso, an Application for Leave to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs for prisoners (Short Form, AO 240) (often called an IFP application). Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 07/30/24. (xc:Pro se party by regular mail. A copy of the Complaint and a Short Form, AO 240 mailed to Riley for Alonso.) (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.) (ad) |
|
Tuesday, July 16, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Notice/Information re Consent of the Parties to MJ
Tue 07/16 3:59 PM
NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (kc) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Notice of Admin Order 217
Tue 07/16 3:58 PM
NOTICE OF ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER NO. 217 to parties re obligation of counsel to keep Court apprised of current contact information. (kc) |
|
2 | 2
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Tue 07/16 3:56 PM
APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Aaron Samson Riley. (kc) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Tue 07/16 3:55 PM
COMPLAINT against Justyn Rhodes, Corey Slusher, filed by Aaron Samson Riley, Jose Bonelges Guillen Alonso. (Plaintiff Alonso did not sign complaint and no contact information was provided.)(kc) |
|
Att: 1 Attachment Incident Reports | ||
misc
Annotation - Docket
Tue 07/16 3:58 PM
Notice mailed to pro se party regarding filing of new case (docket sheet & certificate of service form included). (kc) |