(PC)Owens v. Schultz et al
California Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Sheila K Oberto |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-00820 |
Nature of Suit | 550 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Jul 16, 2024 |
Defendant
A. Chavez
|
|
Defendant
J. Schultz
|
|
Defendant
M. Albanese
|
|
Plaintiff
Marvin LaMarr Owens
|
Docket last updated: 09/11/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Wednesday, August 21, 2024 | ||
10 | 10
3
pgs
order
Order ~Util - 1 Terminate Deadlines and Hearings Order on Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Wed 08/21 2:26 PM
ORDER DISCHARGING7 Order to Show Cause; ORDER GRANTING2 Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis; ORDER DIRECTING Payment of Inmate Filing Fee by California Department of Corrections, signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 8/21/2024. (Rivera, O) |
|
Att: 1 IFP Application | ||
service
Service by Mail
Wed 08/21 2:26 PM
SERVICE BY MAIL:10 Order served on Marvin LaMarr Owens. (Rivera, O) |
||
Monday, August 19, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
misc
Response to Order to Show Cause
Mon 08/19 2:59 PM
RESPONSE to7 ORDER to SHOW CAUSE by Marvin LaMarr Owens. (Maldonado, C) |
|
8 | 8
misc
Consent/Decline of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction
Mon 08/19 2:58 PM
CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Maldonado, C) |
|
Friday, July 19, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
3
pgs
order
Order to Show Cause
Fri 07/19 2:54 PM
ORDER to SHOW CAUSE in Writing Why Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Should Not be Denied, signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 7/19/2024 Show Cause Response due within THIRTY DAYS. (Marrujo, C) |
|
service
Service by Mail
Fri 07/19 2:55 PM
SERVICE BY MAIL:7 Order to Show Cause served on Marvin LaMarr Owens. (Marrujo, C) |
||
Thursday, July 18, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
misc
Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement
Thu 07/18 2:21 PM
PRISONER TRUST FUND ACCOUNT STATEMENT by Marvin LaMarr Owens. (Marrujo, C) |
|
Tuesday, July 16, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Document(s) Served Electronically
Tue 07/16 2:52 PM
DOCUMENT(S) SERVED ELECTRONICALLY: New Case Documents served on Sierra Conservation Center. (Sant Agata, S) |
|
4 | 4
misc
Notice re IFP Submission
Tue 07/16 2:51 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE: The Clerk of Court is in receipt of a Motion to Proceed in Forma Pauperis. The California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation is DIRECTED to submit a certified prison trust account statement for Marvin LaMarr Owens, CDCR No. BR-7832 to the Clerk's Office within 72 business hours of this notification. The prison trust account statement must reflect the activity for the last six months. Please email the certified prison trust account statement in.pdf format to FilingsFresno@caed.uscourts.gov with the case number in the subject line as reflected on this notification. (Text Only Entry) (Sant Agata, S) |
|
3 | 3
order
Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider
Tue 07/16 2:49 PM
PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED. E-Filing Notice issued re complaint filed *7/16/2024*. Consent or Decline due by 8/19/2024. (Sant Agata, S) |
|
Att: 1 Order re Consent, | ||
Att: 2 E-Filing Notice | ||
2 | 2
motion
In Forma Pauperis
Tue 07/16 2:49 PM
MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Marvin LaMarr Owens. (Sant Agata, S) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint
Tue 07/16 2:47 PM
(1983) PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT against All Defendants by Marvin LaMarr Owens. (Sant Agata, S) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |