Cuestas et al v. Thakkar et al
Arizona District Court | |
Judge: | John J Tuchi |
Case #: | 2:24-cv-01750 |
Nature of Suit | 820 Property Rights - Copyrights |
Cause | 17:501 Copyright Infringement |
Case Filed: | Jul 16, 2024 |
Last checked: Saturday Aug 31, 2024 5:12 AM MST |
Defendant
PNGCraftDrive Incorporated
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
ShreejiTemplate Incorporated
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Mansi Thakkar
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Purav Thakkar
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Unknown Parties
|
|
Plaintiff
Sandra Cuestas
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Tinsel Shop Designs LLC
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/11/2024 11:59 PM MST |
Friday, September 06, 2024 | ||
19 | 19
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
Fri 09/06 4:06 PM
ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED granting the Parties' Joint Motion to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint (Third Request) (Doc.17 ). Defendants have until November 4, 2024, to file their answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint (Doc.1 ). Signed by Judge John J Tuchi on 9/6/2024. (JAMA) |
|
Thursday, September 05, 2024 | ||
18 | 18
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
Thu 09/05 2:58 PM
ORDER granting the Defendants' Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer to Plaintiffs' Complaint (Second Request)16 . Defendants have until September 5, 2024, to file their answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint1 . Signed by Judge John J Tuchi on 9/5/2024. (KLG) |
|
17 | 17
motion
Extension of Time to File Answer
Thu 09/05 1:58 PM
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by PNGCraftDrive Incorporated, ShreejiTemplate Incorporated, Mansi Thakkar, Purav Thakkar.(Marion, Michael) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Thursday, August 29, 2024 | ||
16 | 16
motion
Extension of Time to File Answer
Thu 08/29 5:12 PM
Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re:1 Complaint, by PNGCraftDrive Incorporated, ShreejiTemplate Incorporated, Mansi Thakkar, Purav Thakkar.(Marion, Michael) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Thursday, August 08, 2024 | ||
15 | 15
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
Thu 08/08 9:06 AM
ORDER granting the Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer to Plaintiffs' Complaint (First Request)14 . Defendants have until August 29, 2024, to file their answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint1 . Signed by Judge John J Tuchi on 8/8/24. (KLG) |
|
Wednesday, August 07, 2024 | ||
14 | 14
motion
Extension of Time to File Answer
Wed 08/07 5:01 PM
First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re:1 Complaint, by PNGCraftDrive Incorporated, ShreejiTemplate Incorporated, Mansi Thakkar, Purav Thakkar.(Marion, Michael) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
13 | 13
notice
Notice of Appearance/Association of Counsel
Wed 08/07 4:51 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Benjamin Marion on behalf of PNGCraftDrive Incorporated, ShreejiTemplate Incorporated, Mansi Thakkar, Purav Thakkar. (Marion, Michael) |
|
Monday, July 22, 2024 | ||
12 | 12
service
Service Executed
Mon 07/22 10:19 AM
SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Sandra Cuestas, Tinsel Shop Designs LLC: Certificate of Service re: Case Opening Documents upon ShreejiTemplate Inc on Jul 18, 2024. (Dvoren, Michael) |
|
11 | 11
service
Service Executed
Mon 07/22 10:18 AM
SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Sandra Cuestas, Tinsel Shop Designs LLC: Certificate of Service re: Case Opening Documents upon Purav Thakkar on Jul 18, 2024. (Dvoren, Michael) |
|
10 | 10
service
Service Executed
Mon 07/22 10:17 AM
SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Sandra Cuestas, Tinsel Shop Designs LLC: Certificate of Service re: Case Opening Documents upon PNGCraftDrive Inc. on Jul 18, 2024. (Dvoren, Michael) |
|
9 | 9
service
Service Executed
Mon 07/22 10:16 AM
SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Sandra Cuestas, Tinsel Shop Designs LLC: Certificate of Service re: Case Opening Documents upon Mansi Thakkar on Jul 18, 2024. (Dvoren, Michael) |
|
Tuesday, July 16, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
2
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Set Deadlines
Tue 07/16 3:50 PM
ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED directing the Clerk of Court to terminate any or all Defendants in this matter, without further notice, that have not been served within the time required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(m) on October 15, 2024. (See attached Order). Signed by Judge John J Tuchi on 7/16/2024. (JAMA) |
|
7 | 7
2
pgs
order
Order
Tue 07/16 3:48 PM
ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that motions to dismiss pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b) and motions to strike pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(f) are discouraged if the defect that would be the subject of the motion can be cured by filing an amended pleading. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff shall serve a copy of this Order on Defendants. (See attached Order). Signed by Judge John J Tuchi on 7/16/2024. (JAMA) |
|
6 | 6
service
Summons Issued
Tue 07/16 2:40 PM
Summons Issued as to PNGCraftDrive Incorporated, ShreejiTemplate Incorporated, Mansi Thakkar, Purav Thakkar.(REK) |
|
Att: 1 Summons, | ||
Att: 2 Summons, | ||
Att: 3 Summons | ||
5 | 5
misc
New Case Opened
Tue 07/16 2:37 PM
Filing fee paid, receipt number AAZDC-23251302. This case has been assigned to the Honorable John J Tuchi. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV 24-01750 PHX-JJT. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (REK) |
|
4 | 4
service
Summons Submitted
Tue 07/16 2:36 PM
SUMMONS Submitted by Sandra Cuestas, Tinsel Shop Designs LLC. (submitted by Michael Dvoren)(REK) |
|
Att: 1 Summons, | ||
Att: 2 Summons, | ||
Att: 3 Summons | ||
3 | 3
notice
Notice of Filing - Copyright, Trademark or Patent Information
Tue 07/16 2:34 PM
NOTICE of Filing - AO 121 Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action Regarding a Copyright filed by Sandra Cuestas, Tinsel Shop Designs LLC. (submitted by Michael Dvoren) (REK) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Tue 07/16 2:33 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Tinsel Shop Designs LLC. (submitted by Michael Dvoren) (REK) |
|
1 | 1
26
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Tue 07/16 2:31 PM
COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $405.00, receipt number AAZDC-23251302 filed by Tinsel Shop Designs LLC, Sandra Cuestas. (submitted by Michael Dvoren)(REK) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit D, | ||
Att: 5 Civil Cover Sheet |