Cox v. BOWEN
Georgia Middle District Court | |
Judge: | Marc T Treadwell |
Referred: | Charles H Weigle |
Case #: | 5:24-cv-00236 |
Nature of Suit | 530 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - General |
Cause | 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State) |
Case Filed: | Jul 16, 2024 |
Defendant
TOMMY BOWEN
|
|
Petitioner
JOSHUA COX
|
Docket last updated: 11 hours ago |
Monday, August 19, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
cmp
Amended Complaint/Petition
Mon 08/19 9:28 AM
AMENDED1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, against TOMMY BOWEN by JOSHUA COX (YURACHEK, MARK) |
|
notice
Notice of Deficiency
Mon 08/19 9:11 AM
Notice of Deficiency ; Wrong event used. Please re-file, The correct event is Civil Events > Initial Pleadings and Service > Other Initial Documents > Amended Complaint/Petition.(elp) |
||
Friday, August 16, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
misc
Amended Document
Fri 08/16 5:12 PM
AMENDED DOCUMENT by JOSHUA COX,amending1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, (YURACHEK, MARK) |
|
Thursday, July 25, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Attorney Appearance
Thu 07/25 3:39 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by MEGHAN H HILL on behalf of TOMMY BOWEN Attorney MEGHAN H HILL added to party TOMMY BOWEN(pty:dft)(HILL, MEGHAN) |
|
4 | 4
notice
Notice of Attorney Appearance
Thu 07/25 3:26 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by ELIZABETH BROCK on behalf of TOMMY BOWEN Attorney ELIZABETH BROCK added to party TOMMY BOWEN(pty:dft)(BROCK, ELIZABETH) |
|
Wednesday, July 17, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
2
pgs
order
Order to Amend/Recast/Supplement Complaint Order for Response (Habeas Petition)
Wed 07/17 4:43 PM
ORDER to Amend Complaint. ORDER for Respondent to File Responsive Pleading re:1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by JOSHUA COX. Ordered by US MAGISTRATE JUDGE CHARLES H WEIGLE on 7/17/24. (elp) |
|
2 | 2
1
pgs
order
Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge
Wed 07/17 8:45 AM
ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge issued at the direction of the Court. (elp) |
|
notice
Notice of Deficiency
Wed 07/17 8:43 AM
Notice of Deficiency ; Parties were added using punctuation AND/OR title capitalization. The attorney case opening guide states ***REMINDER*** all parties must be added using ALL CAPS (ie LISA SMITH or DELTA AIRLINES). Do not use ANY punctuation when adding new parties. For instructions on adding parties, please refer to the Style Guide located on the website for the Middle District of Georgia. Please do not re-file, corrected by case manager. Notice of Deficiency 1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by CLAYTON LYONS ); This filing does not reflect the e mail address of the filer. Please do not re-file, for future reference only. See Fed.R.Civ.P 11. (elp) Modified on 7/17/2024 TO ADD SECOND NOD TO DOCKET TEXT (elp) |
||
Tuesday, July 16, 2024 | ||
1 | 1
misc
Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus
Tue 07/16 5:52 PM
PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS against TOMMY BOWEN Fee paid: Receipt # AGAMDC-4700318, $5 filed by Joshua Cox(YURACHEK, MARK) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Final Order |