In Re: Dorothy Tarver
Louisiana Middle District Court | |
Judge: | Brian A Jackson |
Case #: | 3:24-mc-00096 |
Cause | no cause specified |
Case Filed: | Jul 16, 2024 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 09/11/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Friday, September 06, 2024 | ||
10 | 10
respm
Response
Fri 09/06 12:02 PM
RESPONSE to Order to Show Cause filed by Dorothy L. Tarver. (Willis, Grant) |
|
Wednesday, August 21, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Enroll Additional Attorney
Wed 08/21 11:48 AM
ORDER granting7 Motion to Enroll Additional Attorney. Added attorney Grant Lloyd Willis,Michael Sean Walsh for Dorothy L. Tarver.. Signed by Judge Brian A. Jackson on 08/21/2024. (ELW) |
|
minutes
Show Cause Hearing
Wed 08/21 4:24 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Brian A. Jackson: Show Cause Hearing held on 8/21/2024. Present: Respondent Dorothy Tarver; Grant L. Willis, Counsel for Respondent Tarver. Respondent may file a memorandum on or before September 6, 2024. (Court Reporter Natalie Breaux.) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (JEG) |
||
Monday, August 19, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
motion
Enroll Additional Attorney
Mon 08/19 12:02 PM
MOTION to Enroll Grant L. Willis and Michael S. Walsh as Additional Attorney by Dorothy L. Tarver(Tarver, Dorothy) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Pleading; Proposed Order | ||
Friday, August 16, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
respm
Response
Fri 08/16 4:01 AM
RESPONSE to Rule to Show Cause filed by Dorothy L. Tarver. (Tarver, Dorothy) |
|
Monday, August 12, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
1
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Set Hearings
Mon 08/12 11:45 AM
ORDER: As to1 Order to Show Cause, a hearing is hereby SET for August 21, 2024, at 10:30 A.M. in Courtroom 2. Dorothy Tarver is entitled to counsel throughout these disciplinary proceedings. The Clerk of Court shall send a copy of this Order and the Order to Show Cause (Doc. 1) to Dorothy Tarver by electronic mail. Signed by Judge Brian A. Jackson on 08/12/2024. (ELW) |
|
Friday, July 26, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Return on Certified Mail
Mon 07/29 11:51 AM
Return on Certified Mail re1 Order to Show Cause. (CIS) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Letter
Mon 07/29 11:45 AM
Letter dated 07/23/2024 from Alan D. Ezkovich, Ezkovich & Co. LLC to Clerk of Court Re: Returning certified mail delivery to Dorothy L. Tarver. (CIS) (Main Document 3 replaced on 7/29/2024 to rotate pages) (CIS) |
|
Monday, July 22, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
misc
Return on Certified Mail
Tue 07/23 11:28 AM
Return on Certified Mail re1 Order to Show Cause. (CIS) |
|
Tuesday, July 16, 2024 | ||
1 | 1
4
pgs
order
Order to Show Cause
Tue 07/16 4:41 PM
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: Within 21 days of the date of this Order, Attorney Dorothy L. Carver shall SHOW CAUSE why sanctions should not be imposed as stated herein. Within 14 days, the Galindo Law Firm, which Tarver lists as her employer on PACER, shall notify the Court regarding the extent, if any, of its relationship with Tarver. Failure to do so may result in a further show cause order. The Clerk of Court shall send a copy of this Order to Dorothy L. Tarver and the Galindo Law Firm by regular and certified mail, return receipt requested to the addresses listed on Pacer and as stated herein. Signed by Judge Brian A. Jackson on 7/16/2024. (JEG) |