Ranir LLC v. CAO Group Inc
Utah District Court | |
Judge: | Robert J Shelby |
Case #: | 2:24-cv-00498 |
Nature of Suit | 830 Property Rights - Patent |
Cause | 28:2201 Declaratory Judgment |
Case Filed: | Jul 16, 2024 |
Last checked: Saturday Aug 31, 2024 6:51 AM MDT |
Defendant
CAO Group Inc
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Ranir LLC
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 9 hours ago |
Tuesday, August 20, 2024 | ||
notice
Notice of Availability of Judicial Settlement Conference
Tue 08/20 12:04 PM
NOTICE OF AVAILABILITY OF JUDICIAL SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. For the benefit of the public and the bar, the District of Utah offers judicial settlement conference as an alternative for dispute resolution assistance in all civil cases and bankruptcy adversary proceedings. The court offers this alternative because, when compared with litigation, it can resolve a dispute faster, at less expense, and with solutions that are better able to meet the parties' needs and interests. Parties may file a stipulated motion for judicial settlement conference. A form[LINK:motion] is available on the court's website. Notice e-mailed or mailed to Defendant CAO Group Inc, Plaintiff Ranir LLC. (mh) |
||
Monday, August 19, 2024 | ||
11 | 11
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Mon 08/19 12:01 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Ranir LLC (Peterson, Nicholas) |
|
Wednesday, July 31, 2024 | ||
10 | 10
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice
Wed 07/31 8:51 AM
ORDER granting 6 , 7 , 8 and 9 Motions for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Julie Bookbinder, Matthew E. Sierawski, Robert Michael Azzi, Vito Anthony Ciaravino for Ranir LLC. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at https://www.pacer.uscourts.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html. Instructions are available at https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing.A Pro Hac Vice Attorney who fails to register for CM/ECF access will not receive notifications of electronic filings. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/rules-practice. ; Signed by Judge Robert J. Shelby on 7/30/2024. (mh) |
|
Tuesday, July 30, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
motion
Admission Pro Hac Vice (fee collected during entry)
Tue 07/30 11:15 AM
MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Vito Anthony Ciaravino , Registration fee $ 50, receipt number AUTDC-5138549, Attorneys awaiting Pro Hac Vice admission should immediately register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at[LINK:https://www.pacer.uscourts.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html] . Registration requests will not be approved until the court has granted the pro hac vice motion. Instructions are available on the court's website at[LINK:https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing] . filed by Plaintiff Ranir LLC.(Huber, John) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit PHV Application, | ||
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order | ||
8 | 8
motion
Admission Pro Hac Vice (fee collected during entry)
Tue 07/30 11:09 AM
MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Robert Michael Azzi , Registration fee $ 50, receipt number AUTDC-5138525, Attorneys awaiting Pro Hac Vice admission should immediately register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at[LINK:https://www.pacer.uscourts.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html] . Registration requests will not be approved until the court has granted the pro hac vice motion. Instructions are available on the court's website at[LINK:https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing] . filed by Plaintiff Ranir LLC.(Huber, John) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit PHV Application, | ||
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order | ||
7 | 7
motion
Admission Pro Hac Vice (fee collected during entry)
Tue 07/30 11:01 AM
MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Matthew E. Sierawski , Registration fee $ 50, receipt number AUTDC-5138499, Attorneys awaiting Pro Hac Vice admission should immediately register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at[LINK:https://www.pacer.uscourts.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html] . Registration requests will not be approved until the court has granted the pro hac vice motion. Instructions are available on the court's website at[LINK:https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing] . filed by Plaintiff Ranir LLC.(Huber, John) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit PHV Application, | ||
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order | ||
6 | 6
motion
Admission Pro Hac Vice (fee collected during entry)
Tue 07/30 10:52 AM
MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Julie Bookbinder , Registration fee $ 50, receipt number AUTDC-5138476, Attorneys awaiting Pro Hac Vice admission should immediately register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at[LINK:https://www.pacer.uscourts.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html] . Registration requests will not be approved until the court has granted the pro hac vice motion. Instructions are available on the court's website at[LINK:https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing] . filed by Plaintiff Ranir LLC.(Huber, John) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit PHV Application, | ||
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order | ||
5 | 5
misc
Rule 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement (Atty)
Tue 07/30 10:43 AM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT under FRCP 7.1 filed by Plaintiff Ranir LLC identifying Ranir Global Holdings, LLC as Corporate Parent. (Huber, John) |
|
Monday, July 29, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
service
Summons Issued Electronically
Mon 07/29 10:09 AM
Summons Issued Electronically as to CAO Group Inc. Instructions to Counsel: 1. Click on the document number. 2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF. 3. Print the issued summons for service. (sg) |
|
Tuesday, July 16, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
misc
Report Regarding Patent and Trademark
Tue 07/16 4:20 PM
Report on the Filing of an action sent to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (kec) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Notice PHV Requirements
Tue 07/16 3:42 PM
NOTICE OF REQUIREMENTS for appearance Pro Hac Vice mailed to attorney Scott J. Bornstein, Julie P. Bookbinder, Jonathan P. Presvelis, and Robert Michael Azzi for Ranir LLC per1 complaint. (kec) |
|
Att: 1 Supplement Pro Hac Vice Notice for attorney Robert Michael Azzi | ||
1 | 1
28
pgs
cmp
Complaint (Atty)
Tue 07/16 3:17 PM
COMPLAINT against CAO Group Inc (Filing fee $ 405, receipt number AUTDC-5125776) filed by Ranir LLC. (Huber, John) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit C, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit D, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit E, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit F, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit G, | ||
Att: 9 Exhibit H, | ||
Att: 10 Exhibit I, | ||
Att: 11 Exhibit J, | ||
Att: 12 Exhibit K, | ||
Att: 13 Exhibit L, | ||
Att: 14 Exhibit M | ||
utility
Add and Terminate Judges
Tue 07/16 3:34 PM
Judge Robert J. Shelby added. Case number will now read 2:24-cv-00498-RJS. Please make changes to document captions accordingly. (kec) |