Morelos v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Arizona District Court | |
Judge: | Jennifer G Zipps |
Case #: | 4:24-cv-00351 |
Nature of Suit | 863 Social Security - DIWC/DIWW (405(g)) |
Cause | 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (DIWC) |
Case Filed: | Jul 16, 2024 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 8 hours ago |
Thursday, September 05, 2024 | ||
17 | 17
misc
Stipulation
Thu 09/05 11:32 AM
STIPULATION for Remand to the Agency by Commissioner of Social Security Administration.(Darcher, Edmund) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
16 | 16
misc
Additional Attachments to Main Document
Thu 09/05 11:06 AM
Additional Attachments to Main Document re:14 Additional Attachments to Main Document,,12 Notice of Filing - Soc. Sec. Admin. Transcript,13 Additional Attachments to Main Document,,15 Additional Attachments to Main Document,, by Defendant Commissioner of Social Security Administration.(Darcher, Edmund) |
|
Att: 1 Medical Records Part 36, | ||
Att: 2 Medical Records Part 37, | ||
Att: 3 Medical Records Part 38, | ||
Att: 4 Medical Records Part 39, | ||
Att: 5 Medical Records Part 40 | ||
15 | 15
misc
Additional Attachments to Main Document
Thu 09/05 11:04 AM
Additional Attachments to Main Document re:14 Additional Attachments to Main Document,,12 Notice of Filing - Soc. Sec. Admin. Transcript,13 Additional Attachments to Main Document,, by Defendant Commissioner of Social Security Administration.(Darcher, Edmund) |
|
Att: 1 Medical Records Part 25, | ||
Att: 2 Medical Records Part 26, | ||
Att: 3 Medical Records Part 27, | ||
Att: 4 Medical Records Part 28, | ||
Att: 5 Medical Records Part 29, | ||
Att: 6 Medical Records Part 30, | ||
Att: 7 Medical Records Part 31, | ||
Att: 8 Medical Records Part 32, | ||
Att: 9 Medical Records Part 33, | ||
Att: 10 Medical Records Part 34 | ||
14 | 14
misc
Additional Attachments to Main Document
Thu 09/05 10:59 AM
Additional Attachments to Main Document re:12 Notice of Filing - Soc. Sec. Admin. Transcript,13 Additional Attachments to Main Document,, by Defendant Commissioner of Social Security Administration.(Darcher, Edmund) |
|
Att: 1 Medical Records Part 14, | ||
Att: 2 Medical Records Part 15, | ||
Att: 3 Medical Records Part 16, | ||
Att: 4 Medical Records Part 17, | ||
Att: 5 Medical Records Part 18, | ||
Att: 6 Medical Records Part 19, | ||
Att: 7 Medical Records Part 20, | ||
Att: 8 Medical Records Part 21, | ||
Att: 9 Medical Records Part 22, | ||
Att: 10 Medical Records Part 23 | ||
13 | 13
misc
Additional Attachments to Main Document
Thu 09/05 10:54 AM
Additional Attachments to Main Document re:12 Notice of Filing - Soc. Sec. Admin. Transcript, by Defendant Commissioner of Social Security Administration.(Darcher, Edmund) |
|
Att: 1 Medical Records Part 3, | ||
Att: 2 Medical Records Part 4, | ||
Att: 3 Medical Records Part 5, | ||
Att: 4 Medical Records Part 6, | ||
Att: 5 Medical Records Part 7, | ||
Att: 6 Medical Records Part 8, | ||
Att: 7 Medical Records Part 9, | ||
Att: 8 Medical Records Part 10, | ||
Att: 9 Medical Records Part 11, | ||
Att: 10 Medical Records Part 12 | ||
12 | 12
notice
Notice of Filing - Soc. Sec. Admin. Transcript
Thu 09/05 10:50 AM
NOTICE of Filing Certified Copy of Administrative Transcript filed by Commissioner of Social Security Administration.(Darcher, Edmund) |
|
Att: 1 Certification, | ||
Att: 2 Transcript Index, | ||
Att: 3 Admin Process, | ||
Att: 4 Payment, | ||
Att: 5 Jurisdictional Part 1, | ||
Att: 6 Jurisdictional Part 2, | ||
Att: 7 Non Disability, | ||
Att: 8 Disability Part 1, | ||
Att: 9 Disability Part 2, | ||
Att: 10 Medical Records Part 1 | ||
Monday, July 22, 2024 | ||
10 | 10
order
Scheduling Order
Mon 07/22 9:41 AM
ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that the parties must fully comply with the following deadlines and procedures re Supplemental Rules for Social Security Actions Under 42 U.S.C. § 405(g). Signed by Magistrate Judge Lynnette C Kimmins on 7/19/2024. (See Order for complete details)(ARC) |
|
Friday, July 19, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
1
pgs
order
Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge for Report and Recommendation
Fri 07/19 2:06 PM
ORDER: This case, reassigned to the Honorable Jennifer G. Zipps, is hereby referred to Magistrate Judge Lynette C. Kimmins for all pretrial proceedings and a report and recommendation in accordance with 28 U.S.C. § 636(b)(1), Fed. R. Civ. P. 72, and 72.2 of the Rules of Practice of the United States District Court for the District of Arizona. All future filings in this case shall be designated: CV 24-00351 TUC-JGZ(LCK). Signed by Judge Jennifer G Zipps on 7/19/2024. (ARC) |
|
8 | 8
minute_ord
~Util - Add and Terminate Judges
Fri 07/19 10:27 AM
MINUTE ORDER: Pursuant to Local Rule 3.7(b), a request has been received for a random reassignment of this case to a District Judge. IT IS ORDERED this case is reassigned by random draw to District Judge Jennifer G Zipps. All further pleadings/papers should now list the following COMPLETE case number: CV-24-351-TUC-JGZ. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (DLC) |
|
Thursday, July 18, 2024 | ||
11 | 11
misc
25 Pct Mag - Election to Assign Case to District Judge
Tue 07/30 11:36 AM
Party Elects Assignment of Case to District Judge Jurisdiction. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (DLC) |
|
6 | 6
notice
Notice of Appearance/Association of Counsel
Thu 07/18 1:45 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Edmund Jack Darcher on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security Administration. (Darcher, Edmund) |
|
Tuesday, July 16, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
misc
25 Pct Mag - Agreement to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction
Wed 07/17 1:12 PM
Agreement to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Party agrees to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (DLC) |
|
3 | 3
misc
New Case Opened
Tue 07/16 3:26 PM
Filing fee paid, receipt number AAZDC-23252100. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Lynnette C Kimmins. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-24-351-TUC-LCK. Magistrate Election form attached. (MCO) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Notice - SS Action Commenced
Tue 07/16 3:24 PM
NOTICE: Social Security Case Service. Pursuant to Rule 3 of the Supplemental Rules for Social Security Actions under 42 U.S.C. 405(g), the Clerk has issued a Notice of Electronic Case Filing (NEF) using the Case Management and Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) system, notifying the appropriate Regional Social Security Administration's Office of General Counsel and the United States Attorney's Office of the case. No summons shall issue. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MCO) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Tue 07/16 3:22 PM
COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 405.00, receipt number AAZDC-23252100 filed by Julio Morelos, Jr. (Miller, Audrey)(MCO) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |