Kincaid v. O'Malley
California Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Edward J Davila |
Case #: | 5:24-cv-04263 |
Nature of Suit | 864 Social Security - SSID Title XVI |
Cause | 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (SSID) |
Case Filed: | Jul 16, 2024 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 09/06/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Monday, July 29, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
misc
Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge
Mon 07/29 2:50 PM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Martin J. O'Malley.. (Highland, Erin) |
|
Wednesday, July 17, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Wed 07/17 9:00 AM
ORDER GRANTING 2 APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 7/17/2024. (ejdlc3, COURT STAFF) |
|
Tuesday, July 16, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
order
Social Security Procedural Order
Tue 07/16 3:28 PM
SOCIAL SECURITY PROCEDURAL ORDER: (cv, COURT STAFF) |
|
3 | 3
utility
~Util - Case Assigned by Intake
Tue 07/16 2:41 PM
Case assigned to Judge Edward J. Davila. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (smc, COURT STAFF) |
|
2 | 2
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Tue 07/16 2:20 PM
First MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Floyd Kincaid. (Alegre, Caroline) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Tue 07/16 1:55 PM
COMPLAINT against Martin J. O'Malley. Filed by Floyd Kincaid.(Alegre, Caroline) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |