Ceja-Rivas
California Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Charles R Breyer |
Referred: | Pslc Llh |
Case #: | 3:24-cv-04255 |
Nature of Suit | 540 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Mandamus & Other |
Cause | 42:1983 Civil Rights Act |
Case Filed: | Jul 16, 2024 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 09/06/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Thursday, August 22, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
1
pgs
order
Order Reassigning Case ~Util - Case Assigned/Reassigned
Thu 08/22 2:15 PM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Charles R. Breyer for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by Clerk on 08/22/2024.(mbc, COURT STAFF) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) |
|
Att: 1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording | ||
6 | 6
oth_evt
Clerk's Notice of Impending Reassignment
Thu 08/22 1:42 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge (klh, COURT STAFF) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) |
|
Wednesday, July 31, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Mail Returned
Wed 07/31 1:44 PM
Returned as undeliverable re1 Letter,3 Clerk's Notice re: IFP,2 Clerk's Notice to File Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint/Habeas Petition on Form,. Mail Returned; response required by 9/30/2024. (kmg, COURT STAFF) |
|
Tuesday, July 16, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Letter
Wed 07/17 12:17 PM
Originating Document: Letter from David Ceja-Rivas to Court. (msr, COURT STAFF) |
|
3 | 3
oth_evt
Notice of Assignment of Prisoner Case to Magistrate Judge
Tue 07/16 3:32 PM
Notice of Assignment of Prisoner Case to Magistrate Judge (msr, COURT STAFF) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) |
|
2 | 2
oth_evt
Clerk's Notice re: IFP
Tue 07/16 3:31 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE re completion of In Forma Pauperis affidavit or payment of filing fee due within 28 days. IFP Form due by 8/23/2024. (msr, COURT STAFF) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) |
|
1 | 1
oth_evt
Clerk's Notice to File Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint/Habeas Petition on Form
Tue 07/16 3:31 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE Petition on Form due by 8/23/2024. (msr, COURT STAFF) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) |