Mohamed v. Sunrise Vessel Operations LLC et al
California Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Joseph C Spero |
Case #: | 3:24-cv-04276 |
Nature of Suit | 340 Torts - Personal Injury - Marine |
Cause | 28:1333 Admiralty |
Case Filed: | Jul 16, 2024 |
Last checked: Saturday Aug 31, 2024 3:09 AM PDT |
Defendant
Pasha Hawaii Holdings, LLC
|
|
Defendant
Sunrise Vessel Operations LLC
|
|
Plaintiff
Hassan Mohamed
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/06/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Friday, September 06, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
oth_evt
Clerk's Notice of Impending Reassignment - Text Only
Fri 09/06 2:50 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (klh, COURT STAFF) |
|
8 | 8
misc
Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge
Fri 09/06 1:18 PM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Hassan Mohamed.. (Llinas Negret, Carlos) |
|
Monday, August 26, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
oth_evt
Clerk's Notice re: Consent or Declination
Mon 08/26 9:39 AM
CLERK'S SECOND NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiff Mohamed shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at:[LINK:http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms] . (Party/parties were also notified via telephone or email.) Consent/Declination due by 9/9/2024. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (klh, COURT STAFF) |
|
Monday, August 05, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
oth_evt
Clerk's Notice re: Consent or Declination
Mon 08/05 1:58 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiff Mohamed shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at:[LINK:http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms] . (Party/parties were also notified via telephone or email.) Consent/Declination due by 8/19/2024. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (klh, COURT STAFF) |
|
Wednesday, July 17, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
order
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines
Wed 07/17 2:59 PM
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 10/9/2024. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/16/2024 02:00 PM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only. (far, COURT STAFF) |
|
4 | 4
utility
~Util - Case Assigned by Intake
Wed 07/17 1:16 PM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 7/31/2024. (as, COURT STAFF) |
|
utility
Electronic Filing Error
Wed 07/17 10:49 AM
[LINK:Electronic filing error] . ONLY ONE SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED PER CASE, USE AN ATTACHMENT TO SUMMONS IF NEEDED TO LIST ADDITIONAL DEFENDANTS INFORMATION [err201]This filing will not be processed by the clerks office.Please re-file in its entirety. Re:2 Proposed Summons filed by Hassan Mohamed,3 Proposed Summons filed by Hassan Mohamed (far, COURT STAFF) |
||
Tuesday, July 16, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
misc
Proposed Summons
Tue 07/16 8:22 PM
Proposed Summons. (Llinas Negret, Carlos) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Proposed Summons
Tue 07/16 8:21 PM
Proposed Summons. (Llinas Negret, Carlos) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Tue 07/16 5:10 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Filed by Hassan Mohamed.(Llinas Negret, Carlos) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |