Bowen v. Monsanto Co.
Consolidated
Lead case: 3:16-md-02741
Lead case: 3:16-md-02741
California Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Vince Chhabria |
Case #: | 3:24-cv-04261 |
Nature of Suit | 365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability |
Case Filed: | Jul 16, 2024 |
Case in other court: | USDC-Eastern District of California - Live System, 2:24-cv-01623-DMC |
Last checked: Saturday Aug 31, 2024 3:09 AM PDT |
Defendant
Monsanto Company
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kevin Bowen
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/06/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Thursday, July 25, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
notice
Notice of Appearance
Thu 07/25 4:41 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua Rhett Harris on behalf of Plaintiff Kevin Bowen (Harris, Joshua) |
|
Tuesday, July 23, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
notice
Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures
Tue 07/23 10:38 AM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Monsanto Company identifying Other Affiliate Bayer AG for Monsanto Company. [RE: Plaintiff Kevin Bowen] (Walker-Stubbs, Jennise) |
|
7 | 7
notice
Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures
Tue 07/23 10:37 AM
Certificate of Interested Entities by Monsanto Company identifying Other Affiliate Bayer AG for Monsanto Company. [RE: Plaintiff Kevin Bowen] (Walker-Stubbs, Jennise) |
|
6 | 6
answer
Answer to Complaint
Tue 07/23 10:36 AM
Defendant Monsanto Company ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand [RE: Plaintiff Kevin Bowen] by Monsanto Company. (Walker-Stubbs, Jennise) |
|
Tuesday, July 16, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
transfer
Case Transferred In - District Transfer
Tue 07/16 5:29 PM
Case Transferred in from United States District Court for the Eastern District of California - Live System (Sacramento) |
|
utility
MDL Member Case
Tue 07/16 5:32 PM
MEMBER CASE OPENED RE MDL 2741: United States District Court Eastern District of California - Live System (Sacramento), 2:24-cv-01623-DMC, Bowen v. Monsanto Co., Opened in California Northern District as 3:24-cv-04261-VC pursuant to Conditional Transfer Order (CTO-467) cc: JPMDL (tn, COURT STAFF) |
||
Monday, July 15, 2024 | ||
4 | 4 MDL ORDER. Case Transferred to the Northern District of California. CASE CLOSED. (Donati, J) | |
Friday, June 07, 2024 | ||
3 | 3 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; (Woodson, A) | |
Att: 1 Consent Form, | ||
Att: 2 VDRP | ||
2 | 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Monsanto Company* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Lindsay R. Stevens* *Gomez Trial Attorneys* *755 Front Street* *San Diego, CA 92101*. (Woodson, A) | |
PAYMENT for Civil Case filing fee in the amount of $ 405, receipt number ACAEDC-11568567. (Stevens, Lindsay) | ||
Wednesday, June 05, 2024 | ||
1 | 1 COMPLAINT against Monsanto Company by Kevin Bowen. Attorney Stevens, Lindsay R. added.(Stevens, Lindsay) | |
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |