Brookside Park v. Dale et al
Georgia Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Eleanor L Ross |
Referred: | J Clay Fuller |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-03113 |
Nature of Suit | 230 Real Property - Rent Lease & Ejectment |
Cause | 28:1446 Notice of Removal - Breach of Contract |
Case Filed: | Jul 15, 2024 |
Terminated: | Aug 12, 2024 |
Last checked: Thursday Aug 29, 2024 6:10 AM EDT |
Defendant
Nyashia Black
1995 Rambling Dr SW 5-527
Atlanta, GA 30315 |
|
Defendant
Angela Dale
1965 Rambling Dr 5-527
Atlanta, GA 30315 |
|
Plaintiff
Brookside Park
2210 Sullivan Road
College Park, GA 30337 |
Docket last updated: 11 hours ago |
Wednesday, September 04, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
misc
Mail Returned
Thu 09/05 11:47 AM
Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Angela Dale re6 Order. Not Deliverable/Unable to Forward. (ajw) |
|
Monday, August 12, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
utility
Remark
Mon 08/12 10:16 AM
Case electronically remanded to Magistrate Court of Fulton County re6 Order. Filing status: Submitted. (ajw) |
|
6 | 6
2
pgs
order
Order on Final Report and Recommendation
Mon 08/12 9:58 AM
ORDER: The Court ADOPTS the R&R as the opinion of this Court. Doc.3 . For the reasons stated in the R&R, the Court REMANDS this case to the Magistrate Court of Fulton County, Georgia. The Court DIRECTS the Clerk to close this case. Signed by Judge Eleanor L. Ross on 08/12/2024. (ajw) |
|
utility
Clerks Certificate of Mailing
Mon 08/12 10:03 AM
Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Brookside Park and Angela Dale re6 Order on Final Report and Recommendation. (ajw) |
||
utility
Terminate Civil Case
Mon 08/12 10:04 AM
Civil Case Terminated. (ajw) |
||
Tuesday, August 06, 2024 | ||
utility
Submission to District Judge
Tue 08/06 5:08 PM
Submission of3 Final Report and Recommendation,,, Order ruling on IFP,, to District Judge Eleanor L. Ross. (mlb) |
||
Wednesday, July 17, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
12
pgs
order
Order
Wed 07/17 2:57 PM
NOTICE FROM THE COURT: INSTRUCTIONS FOR CIVIL CASES ASSIGNED TO THE HONORABLE ELEANOR L. ROSS. (mlb) |
|
4 | 4
2
pgs
order
Order for Service of Report and Recommendation
Wed 07/17 10:50 AM
ORDER for Service of3 Final Report and Recommendation by Magistrate Judge J. Clay Fuller. Each party may file written objections to the Report & Recommendation within 14 days of service. If no objections are filed, the Report & Recommendation may be adopted as the opinion and order of the District Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Clay Fuller on 07/17/2024. (ajw) |
|
3 | 3
motion
Report and Recommendation - Final Order ruling on IFP
Wed 07/17 10:46 AM
FINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re2 Notice of Removal recommending that this action be REMANDED to the Magistrate Court of Fulton County. The Clerk is DIRECTED to terminate the reference of this case to the undersigned Magistrate Judge. The Court GRANTS Defendant's1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis solely for the limited purpose of determining whether this action has been properly removed to this Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Clay Fuller on 07/17/2024. (ajw) |
|
2 | 2
cmp
Notice of Removal
Wed 07/17 10:43 AM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL with COMPLAINT. filed by Angela Dale.(ajw) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
utility
Clerks Certificate of Mailing
Wed 07/17 10:52 AM
Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Nyashia Black, Brookside Park re4 Order for Service of Report and Recommendation,3 Final Report and Recommendation. (ajw) |
||
utility
Clerks Certificate of Mailing
Wed 07/17 3:05 PM
Clerk's Certificate of Mailing to Brookside Park and Angela Dale as to Brookside Park and Angela Dale re5 Order. (mlb) |
||
Tuesday, July 16, 2024 | ||
utility
Submission to Magistrate Judge
Tue 07/16 9:46 AM
Submission of1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis to Magistrate Judge J. Clay Fuller. (tht) |
||
Monday, July 15, 2024 | ||
1 | 1
motion
Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Tue 07/16 9:45 AM
APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Angela Dale.(tht) |
|
Att: 1 Notice of Removal, | ||
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet |