Johnson-Mangham v. Bullock et al
Georgia Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Steve C Jones |
Referred: | Christopher C Bly |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-03114 |
Nature of Suit | 442 Civil Rights - Employment |
Cause | 42:2000 Job Discrimination (Race) |
Case Filed: | Jul 15, 2024 |
Last checked: Thursday Aug 29, 2024 6:11 AM EDT |
Defendant
Lizzy Bullock
|
|
Defendant
Andrew Smith
|
|
Plaintiff
Nafertera Johnson-Mangham
8000 Hillside Climb Way
Snellville, GA 30039 |
Docket last updated: 11 hours ago |
Monday, August 26, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
cmp
Complaint
Mon 08/26 4:35 PM
COMPLAINT, with Jury Demand, filed by Nafertera Johnson-Mangham.(ddm) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
2 | 2
9
pgs
order
Order on Application for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Mon 08/26 4:32 PM
ORDER GRANTING1 Plaintiff's Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis and directing Plaintiff to file an amended complaint by September 27, 2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher C. Bly on 08/26/2024. (ddm) |
|
utility
Clerks Certificate of Mailing
Mon 08/26 4:33 PM
Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Nafertera Johnson-Mangham re2 Order, Title VII form. (ddm) |
||
Tuesday, July 16, 2024 | ||
utility
Submission to Magistrate Judge
Tue 07/16 11:44 AM
Submission of1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, to Magistrate Judge Christopher C. Bly. (jbu) |
||
Monday, July 15, 2024 | ||
1 | 1
motion
Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Tue 07/16 11:44 AM
APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Lizzy Bullock.(jbu) |
|
Att: 1 Complaint, | ||
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet |