PC Maplewood Pointe LLC et al v. Henry
Georgia Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Leigh Martin May |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-03128 |
Nature of Suit | 230 Real Property - Rent Lease & Ejectment |
Cause | 42:3601 Fair Housing Act |
Case Filed: | Jul 16, 2024 |
Terminated: | Jul 17, 2024 |
Last checked: Saturday Aug 31, 2024 5:47 AM EDT |
Defendant
Janell Henry
and All Other Occupants 221 Upper Riverdale Road 17G
Jonesboro, GA 30236 |
|
Plaintiff
PC Maplewood Pointe LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Renters Reference Services Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 11 hours ago |
Wednesday, July 17, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
utility
Remark
Wed 07/17 6:54 PM
Case is electronically remanded to Magistrate Court of Clayton County with certified5 Order and docket sheet. (tht) |
|
5 | 5
6
pgs
order
Order
Wed 07/17 9:17 AM
ORDER: The Clerk is DIRECTED to REMAND this case to the Magistrate Court of Clayton County. Signed by Judge Leigh Martin May on 07/17/2024. (tht) |
|
utility
Clerks Certificate of Mailing
Wed 07/17 9:18 AM
Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Janell Henry re5 Order. (tht) |
||
utility
Terminate Civil Case
Wed 07/17 9:22 AM
Civil Case Terminated. (tht) |
||
Tuesday, July 16, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
motion
Stay
Tue 07/16 4:27 PM
Emergency Request to Stay at the residence 221 Upper Riverdale Rd 17G Jonesboro, GA 30236 Pending Federal Complaint by Janell Henry. (tht) |
|
3 | 3
cmp
Notice of Removal
Tue 07/16 4:23 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL with COMPLAINT filed by Janell Henry.(tht) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
2 | 2
1
pgs
order
Order on Application for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Tue 07/16 4:09 PM
ORDER granting1 Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The Clerk is directed to submit Defendant's "Emergency Request To Stay At [Her] Residence... Pending Federal Complaint" to the District Judge for review. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Clay Fuller on 07/16/2024. (tht) |
|
1 | 1
motion
Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Tue 07/16 2:45 PM
APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Janell Henry.(tht) |
|
Att: 1 Notice of Removal, | ||
Att: 2 Emergency Request to Stay, | ||
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
utility
Submission to Magistrate Judge
Tue 07/16 2:47 PM
Submission of1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis to Magistrate Judge J. Clay Fuller. (tht) |
||
utility
Clerks Certificate of Mailing
Tue 07/16 4:10 PM
Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Janell Henry re2 Order. (tht) |
||
utility
Submission to District Judge
Tue 07/16 4:28 PM
Submission of4 Emergency Request to Stay to District Judge Leigh Martin May. (tht) |