Perry #921614 v. Bartrow et al
Michigan Western District Court | |
Judge: | Ray Kent |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-00724 |
Nature of Suit | 555 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Prison Condition |
Cause | 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Jul 15, 2024 |
defendant
Unknown Bartrow
|
|
defendant
Unknown Bowen
|
|
defendant
Unknown Godell
|
|
defendant
Unknown Leonard
|
|
defendant
Unknown Meyers
|
|
defendant
Unknown Odell
|
|
defendant
Unknown Party #1
|
|
defendant
Unknown Party #2
|
|
defendant
Unknown Party #3
|
|
defendant
Unknown Shultz
|
|
plaintiff
Devin Perry #921614
|
GPO
Aug 29 2024
ORDER LIFTING STAY and REGARDING SERVICE: the Clerk is to arrange for service of this order and the complaint upon the defendants; signed by Magistrate Judge Ray Kent (fhw) |
Docket last updated: 11 hours ago |
Thursday, August 29, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
3
pgs
order
Order Regarding Service - Prisoner
Thu 08/29 1:12 PM
ORDER LIFTING STAY and REGARDING SERVICE: the Clerk is to arrange for service of this order and the complaint upon the defendants; signed by Magistrate Judge Ray Kent (fhw) |
|
utility
Copies Mailed
Thu 08/29 10:17 AM
Copy of Order Removing Case from PEM8 sent via U.S. Mail to Devin Perry #921614 (mlc) |
||
utility
Copies Mailed
Thu 08/29 4:04 PM
Copy of Order Regarding Service - Prisoner9 sent via U.S. Mail to Devin Perry #921614 (mlc) |
||
service
Notice of Lawsuit and Request for Waiver of Service delivered to USM
Thu 08/29 4:05 PM
NOTICE OF LAWSUIT/REQUEST FOR WAIVER of service delivered to USM as to defendants Unknown Bartrow, Unknown Bowen, Unknown Godell, Unknown Leonard, Unknown Meyers, Unknown Odell, Unknown Shultz (mlc) |
||
Wednesday, August 28, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
1
pgs
order
Order Removing Case from PEM
Wed 08/28 10:07 AM
ORDER REMOVING CASE FROM EARLY MEDIATION; not all defendants have entered a limited appearance; signed by Magistrate Judge Ray Kent (fhw) |
|
Thursday, August 22, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
service
Certificate of Service
Thu 08/22 9:27 AM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by defendants Unknown Bartrow, Unknown Bowen, Unknown Godell, Unknown Leonard, Unknown Meyers, Unknown Odell, Unknown Shultz re Attorney Appearance (Limited), (Raines, Austin) |
|
notice
Attorney Appearance (Limited)
Thu 08/22 9:25 AM
(NON-DOCUMENT) LIMITED ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Austin Curtis Raines on behalf of defendants Unknown Bartrow, Unknown Bowen, Unknown Godell, Unknown Leonard, Unknown Meyers, Unknown Odell, Unknown Shultz for purposes of the Prisoner Civil Rights Litigation Early Mediation Program (Raines, Austin) |
||
Monday, August 19, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
notice
Change of Address - Prisoner or Pro Se
Tue 08/20 10:16 AM
CHANGE OF ADDRESS for plaintiff Devin Perry #921614 to Oaks Correctional Facility (slk) |
|
Tuesday, July 23, 2024 | ||
utility
Copies Mailed
Tue 07/23 1:30 PM
Copy of Order Staying Case and Referring to PEM5 sent via U.S. Mail to Michigan Department of Attorney General, Corrections Division with a copy of the complaint (slk) |
||
utility
Copies Mailed
Tue 07/23 1:31 PM
Copy of Order Staying Case and Referring to PEM5 , Order to Proceed IFP - PEM4 sent via U.S. Mail to Devin Perry (slk) |
||
Monday, July 22, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
11
pgs
order
Order Staying Case and Referring to PEM
Mon 07/22 3:14 PM
ORDER STAYING CASE and referring to PEM: the 90-day service period is tolled; participating defendants to enter a limited appearance by August 26, 2024; w/attached PEM forms and Program Description; signed by Magistrate Judge Ray Kent (fhw) |
|
4 | 4
1
pgs
order
Order to Proceed IFP - PEM
Mon 07/22 3:13 PM
ORDER granting plaintiff leave to proceed in forma pauperis; signed by Magistrate Judge Ray Kent (fhw) |
|
Tuesday, July 16, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
misc
Receipt of Case Notice
Tue 07/16 9:58 AM
NOTICE of receipt of case (slk) |
|
utility
Copies Mailed
Tue 07/16 10:03 AM
Copy of Receipt of Case Notice3 sent via U.S. Mail to Devin Perry (slk) |
||
Monday, July 15, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Tue 07/16 9:56 AM
MOTION for leave to proceed in forma pauperis by plaintiff Devin Perry #921614; (slk) |
|
Att: 1 Financial Documents | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Tue 07/16 9:53 AM
COMPLAINT with jury demand against All Defendants filed by Devin Perry #921614 (slk) |
|
misc
Statement Regarding Consent (Prisoner Civil Rights/Habeas Case)
Tue 07/16 9:54 AM
STATEMENT RE CONSENT (as taken from1 ) by plaintiff Devin Perry #921614 consenting to proceed before the Magistrate Judge (slk) |