JAMES v. NORTHERN STATE PRISON et al
New Jersey District Court | |
Judge: | Michael E Farbiarz |
Referred: | Jessica S Allen |
Case #: | 2:24-cv-07787 |
Nature of Suit | 550 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Jul 15, 2024 |
Terminated: | Aug 16, 2024 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 09/11/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Friday, August 16, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
2
pgs
order
Order Granting/Denying In Forma Pauperis Order of Dismissal
Fri 08/16 5:24 PM
Order Denying1 Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis; administratively terminating this matter. Signed by Judge Michael E. Farbiarz on 8/15/2024. (mxw, )(n.m.) |
|
Wednesday, August 07, 2024 | ||
utility
Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings
Wed 08/07 8:56 AM
Set Deadlines as to3 MOTION to Appoint Pro Bono. Motion set for 9/3/2024 before Magistrate Judge Jessica S. Allen. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (ld)(n/m) |
||
Tuesday, August 06, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
motion
Appoint Pro Bono
Wed 08/07 8:53 AM
MOTION to Appoint Pro Bono Counsel by DAMONY JAMES. (ld)(n/m) |
|
Tuesday, July 16, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
notice
Notice of Guidelines for Pro Se Filers
Tue 07/16 3:24 PM
Notice of Guidelines for Appearing Pro Se (and) |
|
Monday, July 15, 2024 | ||
1 | 1
service
Complaint Received
Tue 07/16 9:47 AM
Complaint Received. (and) |
|
Att: 1 Application IFP, | ||
Att: 2 Account Summary, | ||
Att: 3 Envelope |