Rapp v. NOVO NORDISK A/S et al
Pennsylvania Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Karen S Marston |
Case #: | 2:24-cv-03104 |
Nature of Suit | 367 Torts - Personal Injury - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury/Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability |
Case Filed: | Jul 16, 2024 |
Last checked: Saturday Aug 31, 2024 5:57 AM EDT |
Defendant
ELI LILLY AND COMPANY
|
|
Defendant
NOVO NORDISK A/S
|
|
Defendant
NOVO NORDISK INC.
|
|
Plaintiff
Christine Rapp
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/06/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Wednesday, July 17, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
service
Summons Issued
Wed 07/17 11:58 AM
Summons Issued as to ELI LILLY AND COMPANY, NOVO NORDISK A/S, NOVO NORDISK INC.. E-MAILED To: COUNSEL on 7/17/24 (bw) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Notice (Other)
Wed 07/17 10:20 AM
NOTICE by Christine Rapp Corrected Designation Form (PENNOCK, PAUL) |
|
misc
MDL Member Case
Wed 07/17 10:08 AM
MDL-3094 (Judge MARSTON) Member Case. PAED. Case number in EDPA: 24-cv-3104. (sbt) |
||
misc
Attorney Required Forms
Wed 07/17 10:11 AM
Attorneys are required by local rule to complete and file both a Civil Cover Sheet and a Designation Form. PLAINTIFF's counsel is directed to file COMPLETED DESIGNATION FORM in this case using the Notice (Other) docket event located in the Notices category. Certification question asking if the case is related needs to be answered. A signature is also required. (sbt) |
||
Tuesday, July 16, 2024 | ||
1 | 1
50
pgs
cmp
Complaint (Attorney)
Tue 07/16 6:23 PM
COMPLAINT against ELI LILLY AND COMPANY, NOVO NORDISK A/S, NOVO NORDISK INC. ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number APAEDC-17604901.), filed by Christine Rapp.(PENNOCK, PAUL) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Designation Form |