Johnson v. White
South Carolina District Court | |
Judge: | Mary Geiger Lewis |
Referred: | Shiva V Hodges |
Case #: | 5:24-cv-03967 |
Nature of Suit | 550 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights, Federal Filers (Bivens) |
Case Filed: | Jul 15, 2024 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 11 hours ago |
Wednesday, July 31, 2024 | ||
10 | 10
misc
Document Mailed
Wed 07/31 1:52 PM
***DOCUMENTS MAILED:7 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION, 9 Text Order, and8 Order, placed in U.S. Mail from Columbia Clerks Office to Tyrone Johnson 02948-000 FCI Thomson PO Box 1002 Thomson, IL 61285. (cpri) |
|
9 | 9
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Wed 07/31 1:48 PM
TEXT ORDER granting 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis as addressed in 8 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Shiva V. Hodges on 07/31/2024. (cpri) |
|
8 | 8
2
pgs
order
Order
Wed 07/31 1:47 PM
ORDER, directing the Clerk of Court not to issue the summons at this time. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shiva V. Hodges on 07/31/2024. (cpri) |
|
7 | 7
motion
Report and Recommendation
Wed 07/31 1:43 PM
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION recommending that this matter be summarily dismissed without leave for amendment. If the district judge accepts this recommendation, Plaintiff's Motion to Appoint Counsel will be rendered moot. ECF. No. 3 . Objections to R&R due by 8/14/2024. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shiva V. Hodges on 07/31/2024. (cpri) |
|
Monday, July 15, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
misc
True Division for Trial
Tue 07/16 2:37 PM
TRUE DIVISION FOR TRIAL: Orangeburg County. (cpri) |
|
3 | 3
motion
Appoint Counsel
Tue 07/16 2:30 PM
MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Tyrone Johnson. Response to Motion due by 7/29/2024. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45.. Motions referred to Shiva V. Hodges. (cpri) (cpri, ) |
|
Att: 1 Supporting Documents, | ||
Att: 2 Envelope | ||
Att: 3 (7/16/2024) Memo in Support | ||
2 | 2
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Tue 07/16 2:29 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Tyrone Johnson. Response to Motion due by 7/29/2024. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45.. Motions referred to Shiva V. Hodges. (cpri) |
|
Att: 1 Financial Certificate, | ||
Att: 2 Supporting Documents, | ||
Att: 3 Envelope | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Tue 07/16 2:27 PM
COMPLAINT against David P. White, filed by Tyrone Johnson.. (cpri) |
|
Att: 1 Affidavit in Support by Tyrone Johnson, | ||
Att: 2 Affidavit of Gloria Warren, | ||
Att: 3 Envelope |