Warix v. Hernandez et al
Arizona District Court | |
Judge: | Diane J Humetewa |
Case #: | 2:24-cv-01741 |
Nature of Suit | 350 Torts - Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle |
Cause | 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Tort/Motor Vehicle (P.I.) |
Case Filed: | Jul 15, 2024 |
Last checked: Thursday Aug 29, 2024 2:55 AM MST |
Defendant
Crete Carrier Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Johnny Hernandez
|
|
Defendant
Unknown Hernandez
|
|
Defendant
Unknown Parties
|
|
Plaintiff
Robert Warix
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 8 hours ago |
Friday, August 16, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
3
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Consolidate Cases
Fri 08/16 10:01 AM
ORDER: The Motion to Consolidate the present action No. 2:24-cv-01740-DJH with No. 2:24-cv-01741-DGC (Doc. 14) is GRANTED. The Clerk of Court shall kindly consolidate these two matters under 2:24-cv-01740-DJH. All future filings pertaining to these cases shall be filed in Case 2:24-cv-01740-DJH only. Signed by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 8/15/2024. (Associated Cases: 2:24-cv-01740-DJH, 2:24-cv-01741-DGC) (KJ) |
|
Wednesday, July 31, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
motion
Consolidate Cases
Wed 07/31 12:21 PM
MOTION to Consolidate Cases by Crete Carrier Corporation, Crete Carrier Corporation. (Associated Cases: 2:24-cv-01740-DJH; 2:24-cv-01741-DGC) (Norton, Lauren) |
|
Monday, July 22, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Mon 07/22 3:24 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Crete Carrier Corporation identifying Corporate Parent Crete Carrier Corporation for Crete Carrier Corporation. (Norton, Lauren) |
|
5 | 5
misc
Demand for Jury Trial by Defendant
Mon 07/22 3:23 PM
DEFENDANT'S DEMAND for Jury Trial by Crete Carrier Corporation. (Norton, Lauren) |
|
4 | 4
answer
Answer to Complaint
Mon 07/22 3:22 PM
ANSWER to1 Notice of Removal, to Plaintiff Complaint by Crete Carrier Corporation.(Norton, Lauren) |
|
Tuesday, July 16, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
notice
Notice of Deficiency re Disclosure Statement
Tue 07/16 10:53 AM
NOTICE TO PARTY RE: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT: Pursuant to FRCiv 7.1 and LRCiv 7.1.1 the attached Disclosure Statement form must be filed by all nongovernmental corporate parties with their first appearance. A supplemental statement must be filed upon any change in the information. In addition, if not already filed, the Disclosure Statement should be filed within 14 days. Disclosure Statement Deadline set as to Crete Carrier Corporation. (REK) |
|
Monday, July 15, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
misc
New Case Opened
Tue 07/16 10:52 AM
Filing fee paid, receipt number AAZDC-23247662. This case has been assigned to the Honorable David G Campbell. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV 24-01741 PHX-DGC. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (REK) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Notice of Removal
Tue 07/16 10:42 AM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Maricopa County Superior Court, case number CV2024-007287. Filing fee received: $405.00, receipt number AAZDC-23247662 filed by Crete Carrier Corporation. (submitted by Lauren Norton)(REK) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C, | ||
Att: 4 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 5 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet | ||
service
Service Unexecuted
Tue 07/16 10:47 AM
***State Court record received on 7/15/2024***Service Returned Unexecuted by Robert Warix: Summons and Complaint as to Unknown Hernandez and Johnny Hernandez.***Return of Process Server docketed in U.S. District Court on 7/15/2024 for case management purposes.*** (REK) |
||
service
Service Executed
Tue 07/16 10:51 AM
***State Court record received on 7/15/2024***SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Robert Warix: Affidavit of Service re: Summons, Complaint, Demand for Jury Trial, Plaintiff's Tier Selection, and Certificate of Compulsory Arbitration upon Crete Carrier Corporation on 6/13/2024.***Affidavit of Special Process Server filed in State Court on 6/26/2024, docketed in U.S. District Court on 7/15/2024 for case management purposes.*** (REK) |